Galgano v. County of Putnam, New York et al
Plaintiff: George Galgano
Defendant: County of Putnam, New York, Putnam County District Attorney's Office, Town of Carmel, New York, Town of Carmel Police Department, Adam Levy, Andres Gil, Heather Abissi, Henry Lopez, Lourdes Gonzalez and Michael T. Nagle
Case Number: 7:2016cv03572
Filed: May 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: White Plains Office
County: Westchester
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M. Karas
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER: As such, it is hereby ORDERED that all records related to the prosecution of Lia LoRusso, indictment number 14-043, previously sealed pursuant to New York State Criminal Procedure Law § 160.50 are hereby unsealed; and it is further O RDERED that Defendant County of Putnam produce all non-privileged records related to the prosecution of Lia LoRusso, indictment number 14-043, to all other parties; and it is further ORDERED that records unsealed pursuant to this order arc only to be used in relation to this litigation. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 10/27/2020) (ks)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER: denying 415 Motion. Accordingly, Levy's motion is DENIED. The Clerk shall close Dkt. 415. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 10/13/2020) (ama) Modified on 10/14/2020 (kgo).
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER granting 392 Motion to Compel; granting 396 Motion for Discovery; denying 399 Motion to Unseal. Accordingly, plaintiffs broad relevance objection to defendants' otherwise unremarkable document demands is OVERRULED, and Defend ants' motions to compel are GRANTED. Motion to Unseal the "Third Grand Jury". In his second amended complaint, plaintiff has excised references to Putnam County Grand Jury Investigation Number 15-INV-008, the 'so-called &qu ot;Third Grand Jury." The Individual Defendants now move to unseal the record of that proceeding. [Dkts. 399-401, 410.] Putnam County joins in the motion. [Dkt. 402.] Plaintiff opposes. [Dlct. 407.] Under New York law, "a party seeking di sclosure of grand jury minutes must establish a compelling and particularized need[.]" People v. Robinson, 98 N.Y.2d 755, 756 (2002). Federal comis similarly require that, because "grand jury materials... are traditionally protected by a 'General Rule of Secrecy[,]'" a party seeking disclosure "must make a particularized showing of compelling need; proof of mere relevance, economy, and efficiency will not suffice." United States v. Charmer Industries, Inc , 711 F.2d 1164, 1174 (2d Cir. 1983). Applying that high standard, I find that defendants have not established a compelling need to unseal proceedings before the Third Grand Jury. While evidence presented to that body may be relevant to plaintiffs claims, plaintiffs complaint (as now configured) is addressed to two earlier grand jury investigations (and their sequelae) and does not directly implicate the Third Grand Jury. Defendants' desire to cull impeachment material or "bad ac ts" evidence from the record before that Grand Jury is not a sufficient basis to order their disclosure. Accordingly, defendants' motion to unseal the Third Grand Jury is DENIED. The Clerk shall close Dkts. 392, 396, and 399. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 9/24/2020) (ks)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER: This Order addresses a dispute regarding whether plaintiff is obligated to release treatment records of his psychotherapist, Mr. James Blechman. The parties have submitted letter-briefs, [Dkts. 372, 378, 380.] Familiarity with the record i s assumed. As further set forth herein. In view of plaintiffs arguably broader descriptions of his emotional distress, plaintiff may withhold Mr. Blechman's therapy records only provided that he enters into a stipulation formally disavowin g any claim for non-garden-variety emotional injuries and expressly agreeing not to offer evidence regarding his therapy or any diagnosis he may have received. See e.g. Weber v. Res. Training Ctr., Inc., 2014 U.S. Dist. Lexis 176848 at* 5 (E.D.N.Y. Dec. 23, 20 I 4)(requiring affidavit); Jacobs v. Conn. CMTY. Tech. Colleges, 258 F.R.D. 192, 197 (D. Conn. 2009). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 9/9/2020) (ks)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER: Beginning March 30, 2020, until further notice, all parties to civil conferences before Judge Davison shall attend by phone, using the following information: Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1839 Access Code: 5999739 The parties should call in f rom a landline and announce their names before speaking. For Settlement Conferences: Clients should NOT be on the conference call. Counsel must have ready telephonic access to clients. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 7/22/2020) (ks)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 367 NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION: For the week of July 13, 2020, the Court will hold all conferences, hearings, and/or oral arguments by telephone. Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA tol l-free): (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 7702195 Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign(#). Given that much of the Court is operating remotely and has limited mail capability, counsel involved in any prose cases shall mail a copy of this Notice to or otherwise inform the pro se party of the above teleconference information. Counsel in any pro se inmate cases shall ensure that the pro se party is on the line before calling the above-referenced number. For initial conferences, counsel shall submit a proposed case management and discovery schedule via ECF by 5 p.m. on the evening before the initial conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 7/10/2020) (jca)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 364 OPINION & ORDER re: 338 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Henry Lopez, Lourdes Gonzalez, Adam Levy, Andres Gil, 339 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State A Claim. filed by County of Putnam, New York, 352 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Exhibit to Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Maurizio Savoiardo dated January 7, 2020. filed by Henry Lopez, Lourdes Gonzalez, Adam Levy, Andres Gil, [3 49] MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Michael T. Nagle, Town of Carmel, New York., For the foregoing reasons, both Putnam County's and Putnam Individual Defendants' Motions are denied in full. Carmel Defendants' Motion is gra nted with respect to all claims against Carmel, but denied as to Nagle. As this is the second adjudication of Plaintiffs claims, dismissal is with prejudice. The Court will hold a status conference on July 14, 2020 at 2 p.m. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully requested to terminate the pending Motions. (Dkt. Nos. 338, 339, 349, and 352.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 7/2/2020) ( Status Conference set for 7/14/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (ks)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER granting 337 Motion to Seal Document. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/16/2019) (kv)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galgano v. County of Putnam, New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Galgano
Represented By: Nicholas A. Gravante, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Putnam, New York
Represented By: Shannon Sarles Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Putnam County District Attorney's Office
Represented By: Shannon Sarles Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Carmel, New York
Represented By: Michael E. Longo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Carmel Police Department
Represented By: Michael E. Longo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Levy
Represented By: Shannon Sarles Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andres Gil
Represented By: Shannon Sarles Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Abissi
Represented By: Shannon Sarles Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Lopez
Represented By: Shannon Sarles Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lourdes Gonzalez
Represented By: Shannon Sarles Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael T. Nagle
Represented By: Michael E. Longo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?