Kaltner et al v. Stewart et al
Plaintiff: |
George Kaltner, Avatar Outsourcing, Inc., Voiceless Technologies, Inc., Avatar Technologies, Inc. and Sales Technologies, Inc. |
Defendant: |
David Stewart, David TPO, LLC, Avatar Dialler, Ltd., Avatardialler.com, John Does 1-20, John Does 21-40, Corporations A-J and Corporations K-T |
Case Number: |
7:2016cv09337 |
Filed: |
December 4, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
White Plains Office |
County: |
Westchester |
Presiding Judge: |
Kenneth M. Karas |
Nature of Suit: |
Trademark |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1051 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 20, 2020 |
Filing
224
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been advised that all claims asserted herein have been settled, it is ORDERED that the above-entitled action be and is hereby dismissed and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within thirty days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed within thirty days of this Order; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on th at basis. Further, if the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing any settlementagreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court within the same thirty day period to be "so ordered" b y the Court. Per Paragraph 4(B) of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases, unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. Any pending motions are denied. All conferences are vacated. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 4/20/2020) (ama)
|
April 3, 2020 |
Filing
220
ORDER terminating 201 Motion for Entry of Default. On November 1, 2019, Plaintiffs submitted a "Motion for Entry of Default" as to some Defendants. However, this submission did not use the correct form and was not stylized correctly on ECF, so the Clerk of Court never issued a certificate of default as to any of these parties. A form request for the Clerks certificate of default is available on the Southern District of New York's website. To the extent Plaintiffs wish to pursu e a default judgment against any Defendants who have not timely answered, Plaintiffs are instructed to refile their request for a certificate of default, along with all other necessary papers in the manner prescribed by the rules of the Southern District of New York and the Individual Rules of this Court. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate the Motion at Docket No. 201. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 4/3/2020) (mml)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?