Nemes et al v. Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Jean M. Nemes and James Nemes |
Defendant: |
Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. and Barnett Outdoors, LLC |
Case Number: |
7:2017cv01688 |
Filed: |
March 7, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
White Plains Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Nelson Stephen Roman |
Nature of Suit: |
Personal Injury- Product Liability |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 23, 2021 |
Filing
72
OPINION & ORDER re: 69 FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment seeking Dismissal of the Action. filed by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Barnett Outdoors, LLC. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 69, terminate this action, and enter judgment for the Defendants accordingly. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 2/23/2021) (rj) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
|
August 23, 2019 |
Filing
65
OPINION AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' Motion to Preclude is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs' expert, Brian O'Donel, may opine as to the Lady Raptor posing a substantial likelihood of harm and causin g Mrs. Nemes's injury. Plaintiffs' Motion to Preclude is also GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Experts John V. Grace and Michael Van Durme may opine as to the general design features of crossbows and general causes of crossbow injuries , but they may not open as to what they believe factually occurred with Mrs. Nemes on October 18, 2016. The parties are directed to confer and submit a case management plan by September 20, 2019. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 53, 56, and 57. This constitutes the Court's Opinion and Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 8/23/2019) (jca)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?