St. Christopher's, Inc. v. Forgione et al
Plaintiff: |
St. Christopher's, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Joseph M. Forgione and JMF Acquisitions, LLC |
Case Number: |
7:2017cv04757 |
Filed: |
June 22, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
White Plains Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Cathy Seibel |
Nature of Suit: |
All Other Real Property |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 23, 2022 |
Filing
115
ORDER: In order to facilitate the progress of pre-trial discovery of this litigation in a just, speedy and inexpensive manner, to ensure compliance with the case management plan, and to prevent the accumulation of unresolved discovery issues, the following procedures will be followed for the resolution of discovery disputes: The party objecting to disclosure, claiming an insufficient response to a discovery request or asserting a privilege bears the burden of coming forward by bringing the dispute to the attention of the Court as hereinafter set forth. ( As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 11/23/2022) (vfr)
|
October 13, 2020 |
Filing
96
FINAL JUDGMENT: THIS CAUSE coming on for entry of final judgment on the entire matter in the above-styled cause; IT IS HEREBY ENTERED AND ADJUDGED, that: 1. Final Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiff, St. Christopher's, Inc. against Defendants, Joseph M. Forgione and JMF Acquisitions, LLC dismissing Defendants' First Amended Counterclaim and its individual counts. The Clerk shall close the case. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 10/13/2020) (mml)
|
March 12, 2020 |
Filing
89
ORDER: Beginning March 16, 2020, all parties to civil conferences may attend by phone, using the following information: Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1839 Access Code: 1047966 The parties should call in from a landline and announce their names before speaking. This Order is subject to revocation at any time. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 3/12/2020) (cf)
|
July 11, 2019 |
Filing
87
OPINION AND ORDER: Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff's motion to dismiss JMF's counterclaims is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the pending motion. (Doc. 79.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 7/11/2019) (jca)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?