Tyson v. The Town of Ramapo et al
Plaintiff: Yolanda D. Tyson
Defendant: The Town of Ramapo, Christopher P. St. Lawrence, Yitzchok Ullman, Samuel Tress, Brendel Charles, Patrick J. Withers, Brad R. Weidel, Peter F. Brower and Thomas Cokeley
Case Number: 7:2017cv04990
Filed: July 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: White Plains Office
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M. Karas
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting 98 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. The pre-motion conference scheduled for 9/20/2022 is adjourned to 11/10/2022 at 10:30 a.m. to be held in Courtroom 520. By 10/7/2022, defendants shall serve plaintiff wi th their revised Rule 56.1 Statement; by 10/21/2022, plaintiff shall serve her responses and counterstatement on defendants; by 10/28/2022, defendant shall respond to plaintiff's counterstatement and file via ECF a pre-motion letter explaining the changes made to the Rule 56.1 Statement and the basis for their anticipated motion, together with a copy of the revised Rule 56.1 Statement; and by 11/4/2022, plaintiff shall file her response to the pre-motion letter. SO ORDERED. Pre-Motion Conference set for 11/10/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 520, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Philip M. Halpern. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 9/16/2022) (tg)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER The parties appeared for an in-person case management conference today. The Court heard argument on defendants' pre-motion conference letter (Doc. 92) and plaintiff's response thereto (Doc. 93). For the reasons stated on the recor d, by August 23, 2022, defendants shall produce to plaintiff the unredacted documents concerning the eleven proposed comparators regarding 207-c and light/modified duty, as discussed at the conference. On August 23, 2022, Plaintiff shall confirm r eceipt of the production in a letter to the Court filed by ECF. The continued summary judgment pre-motion conference will thereafter be scheduled.The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate the pending letter-motion (Doc. 92). SO ORD ERED. Motions terminated: 92 LETTER MOTION for Conference Request for Pre-Motion Conference in Anticipation of Motion for Summary Judgment addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Leo Dorfman dated July 30, 2022. filed by Christopher P. St. Lawrence, The Town of Ramapo, Samuel Tress, Brendel Charles, Yitzchok Ullman, Christopher P. St. Lawrence, Patrick J. Withers, Brendel Charles, Brad R. Weidel. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 8/9/2022) (jca)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 4/25/2022) (jca)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER: Due to the extension of the discovery schedule, the case management conference previously scheduled for 6/9/2020 is adjourned to 9/10/2020 at 2:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 6/1/2020) ( Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Philip M. Halpern.) (ks)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 CALENDAR NOTICE: Please take notice that the above captioned matter has been scheduled for: Status Conference before the Honorable Kenneth M. Karas, United States District Judge, on Tuesday, January 7, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 521, U.S. Dist rict Court, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, New York 10601. Any scheduling difficulties must be brought to the attention of the Court in writing, at least five business days beforehand. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 1/7/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 521, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/17/2019) (jca)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 OPINION & ORDER re: 48 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Thomas Cokeley, Christopher P. St. Lawrence, The Town of Ramapo, Brendel Charles, Samuel Tress, Yitzchok Ullman, Christopher P. St. Lawrence, Patrick J. Withers, Peter F. B rower, Brendel Charles, Brad R. Weidel., Thomas Cokeley (as Captain, Police Department Town of Ramapo, Individually ), Thomas Cokeley (as Captain, Police Department Town of Ramapo, and sued in their official capacities as employees of the Town of Ramapo), Peter F. Brower (as Former Chief of Police, Police Department Town of Ramapo, and sued in their official capacities as employees of the Town of Ramapo) and Peter F. Brower (as Former Chief of Police, Police Department Town of Ramapo, Individually) terminated. For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants Defendants' Motion To Dismiss with respect to Plaintiff's § 1983 and NYSHRL § 296 claims against Defendants Brower and Cokeley. Plaintiff's claims survi ve against all other Defendants, but only with respect to her termination. The claims that are dismissed are dismissed without prejudice. Although Plaintiff has filed an Amended Complaint in this Action, this is the first adjudication on Defendants M otion to Dismiss. See Rennalls v. Alfredo, No. 12-CV-5300, 2015 WL 5730332, at *5 n.6 (S.D.N.Y. Sept. 30, 2015) ("[The] Court will afford Plaintiff an opportunity to amend if, after reviewing this Order and Opinion and the law therein, he still believes that he can plausibly state claims against Defendants."). If Plaintiff wishes to file a Second Amended Complaint alleging additional facts and otherwise addressing the deficiencies identified above, Plaintiff must do so within 30 days o f the date of this Opinion & Order. Failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this Action with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is respectfully direct to terminate the pending Motion, (see Dkt. No. 48.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/25/2019) (kv) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyson v. The Town of Ramapo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda D. Tyson
Represented By: Eric Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Town of Ramapo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher P. St. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yitzchok Ullman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Tress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brendel Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J. Withers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad R. Weidel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter F. Brower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Cokeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?