Allen et al v. Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Plaintiff: Larry Griner, Shauna N. Guenther, Andrea F. Benthusen, Donald L. Benthusen, Allen Goughanour, Kareem Saunders, Dina Abbott, Rober Gooch, Lisa Collins, Willie D. McLead, Miles Abbott, Jamie Lee Harris, Pamela Barlow, Danielle J. Melnyk, Frederick Mullins, Glenn Melnyk, Jeffrey Dishong, Beatrice L. Griner, Lanika R. Saunders, Kiesha Allen, Rachel Coughanour, Lakeisha R. McLeod, Jennifer R. Widmer, Alice M. Dishong and Melissa Gooch
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 7:2017cv09597
Filed: December 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: White Plains Office
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pr
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Christopher Adam Seeger on behalf of Minyonna P. Watson. New Address: Seeger Weiss LLP, 55 Challenger Road, 6th FL, Ridgefield Park, New Jersey, 07660, 212-584-0700. Filed In Associated Cases: 7:13-md-02434-CS-LMS et al.(Seeger, Christopher)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER in case 7:13-cv-00773-CS; granting (3324) Motion for Luke F. Callahan to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 7:13-md-02434-CS-LMS (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:13-md-02434-CS-LMS et al. (Seibel, Cathy)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: On January 23, 2018, a Notice of Court Conference was issued in Docket Number 7:13-MD-2434, (Doc. 3317), and all related cases, scheduling a telephone conference for Friday, January 26, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. This telephone conference was set up in response to the letter to the Court dated January 22, 2018 from Lead Counsel for Defendants and Plaintiffs Steering Committee. (No. 7:13-MD-2434, Doc. 3315; No. 7:13-MC-2434, Doc. 238.) The only counsel required to be on the call are Ms. Shayna Cook, Lead Counsel for Defendants, and Mr. Michael K. Johnson on behalf of the Plaintiffs Steering Committee. Other counsel may participate if they so choose, but they are not required to do so.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 1/24/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 7:13-md-02434-CS-LMS et al. (mml)
January 23, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: A telephone conference is scheduled for Friday, January 26, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. before the Hon. Cathy Seibel. Telephone Conference set for 1/26/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Cathy Seibel. Filed In Associated Cases: 7:13-md-02434-CS-LMS et al.(ap)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER NO. 32 (Cases Transferred to MDL During Appeal) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: CASES TRANSFERRED TO MDL DURING APPEAL. This Order shall apply to cases transferred to this Court after the Court's Opinion and Order dated July 28, 2016, granting summary judgment to Defendants in all cases pending in MDL No. 2434 ("Summary Judgment Order"). Plaintiffs whose claims are transferred to MDL 2434 while the Second Circuit appeal of the Summary Judgment Order is pending shall be conditionally dismissed without prejudice pending the Second Circuit's decision on the appeal. If the Second Circuit affirms the Court's Summary Judgment Order in its entirety, and any further petition for rehearing or certiorari is unsuccessful and the decision becomes final, Plaintiffs whose claims were conditionally dismissed shall have 60 days to show cause as to why her claim should not be dismissed with prejudice under the Summary Judgment Order. Defendants may respond within 30 days. The Court will dismiss with prejudice the claims of any Plaintiff who does not file a show-cause brief within 60 days or who is unable to show cause as to why her claim should not be dismissed. If the Second Circuit reverses the Summary Judgment Order in whole or in part, and any further petition for rehearing or certiorari is unsuccessful and the decision reversing the Summary Judgment Order becomes final, then the Court will enter an order reinstating the claims of the Plaintiffs whose claims were conditionally dismissed without prejudice. Defendants agree that the original filing date of those claims would govern for statute of limitations purposes if Plaintiffs' claims are reinstated in the MDL. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 11/10/2016) (ama) Modified on 12/8/2017 (ama).
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER NO. 20 (Severance of Multi-Plaintiff Cases): By Order dated April 8, 2013, the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ordered centralization of certain cases in this Court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 specifically, cases that primarily involve injuries allegedly caused by the Mirena intrauterine contraceptive system, as a result of migration of the product away from its original position, perforation of the uterus, and/or inadequacy of the warning label. (See Doc. 1.) Other cases have been transferred for inclusion in the In re Mirena multidistrict litigation ("MDL") over time, and it is expected that additional cases will continue to be added. (See, e.g., 13-md-2434, Docs. 7, 64, 70, 75, 93, 97, 105, 129, 152, 163, 169, 195, 223, 231, 233, 267, 301, 318, 322, 329, 347, 362, 375, 391, 397, 400, 439, 470, 488, 506, 512, 536, 542, 580, 581, 623, 676, 687, 719, 745, 757, 765, 801, and 830.) Of the cases which have been transferred for inclusion in the In re Mirena MDL, at least seventeen include multiple plaintiffs. (See Exhibit A.) The Plaintiffs' Steering Committee and counsel for Defendants agree that such multi-plaintiff cases require severance, under FED. R. CIV. P. 20 and 21. Claims brought by different plaintiffs which involve common legal issues, but which allege totally different facts, may not be grouped into a single action. FED. R. CIV. P. 20(a). Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 21, federal courts are authorized, at any time, on just terms, to sever claims. A Court's authority to order severance is not limited to cases of misjoinder; rather, the Court has broad discretion to invoke Rule 21 "to prevent prejudice or promote judicial efficiency." Lopez v. City of Irvington, No. 05-CV-5323, 2008 WL 565776, at *2 (D.N.J. 2008); see Wyndham Assocs. v. Bintliff, 398 F.2d 614, 618 (2d Cir. 1968) (not limiting Rule 21 severance to cases of misjoinder); 4 James Wm. Moore et al., Moore's Federal Practice 21.02(1) (3d ed. 2007) (courts may issue severance orders under Rule 21, even in the absence of misjoinder and non-joinder of parties, "to construct a case for the efficient administration of justice"). An action severed under Rule 21 becomes a separate action. Cases in the In re Mirena MDL that involve multiple plaintiffs with common legal issues but different facts must be severed, so that the allegations of each woman who suffered direct personal injury as a result of the use of the Mirena contraceptive system (the "primary plaintiff") are presented in a separate Complaint. Therefore, as to the cases on Exhibit A, and any other multi-plaintiff cases transferred into the In re Mirena MDL, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The Clerk of the Court shall file this Order in any multi-plaintiff case (as defined). 2. For those cases listed on Exhibit A, within forty-five (45) days of the ECF filing date of this Order, each primary plaintiff shall file a "Severed and Amended Complaint" in this Court. 3. For those multi-plaintiff cases which require severance and are transferred into the In re Mirena MDL after the date of this Order, each primary plaintiff shall file a "Severed and Amended Complaint" within forty-five (45) days of this Order being filed in connection with that transferred case. 4. Each Severed and Amended Complaint shall be filed on ECF under the original docket number, at which time counsel filing such Severed and Amended Complaint shall send a notice by email of such filing to Shante Jones, Deputy Clerk of the MDL Unit of the Clerk of Court, at Shante_Jones@nysd.uscourts.gov and HelpDesk@nysd.uscourts.gov. Upon such notice the Clerk of Court is directed to sever each such case and assign a separate civil case number to each case so filed, except for the first named primary plaintiff in each such case, whose Severed and Amended Complaint shall not be severed, and shall be filed under the initial SDNY docket number assigned to that multi-plaintiff case. The Clerk of Court shall incorporate all such severed cases into this MDL. 5. Unless amendment without leave of the Court is permitted under FED. R. CIV. P. 15(a) and this Court's Orders, each severed and Amended Complaint shall contain only the specific claims already asserted by the primary plaintiff (and by any secondary or tertiary plaintiff) against any defendant already named in the original multi-plaintiff case. In other words, no Severed and Amended Complaint shall assert any claim or name any defendant not already set forth in the original multi-plaintiff action, unless Rule 15(a) and this Court's Orders permit. 6. Each plaintiff filing a Severed and Amended Complaint is responsible for ensuring that any defendant named in that Severed and Amended Complaint is served with that Severed and Amended Complaint through ECF or in any other fashion permitted under FED. R. CIV. P. 5 or agreed to in previous Orders. 7. The Clerk of Court shall waive any filing fee associated with the filing of any Severed and Amended Complaint pursuant to this Order. 8. Any failure to comply with any one or more requirements of this Order may upon motion by a concerned defendant or by action of the Court, sua sponte, upon notice to the interested party or parties result in dismissal of the Plaintiff's or Plaintiffs' claim(s) in whole or in part. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 4/29/2014) (sjo)
December 7, 2017 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
December 7, 2017 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
December 7, 2017 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sjo)
December 7, 2017 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 7:13-md-02434-CS-LMS. (sjo)
December 7, 2017 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 7:13-md-02434-CS-LMS. (sjo)
December 7, 2017 Filing 21 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number: 4:17-cv-02026. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Southern District of New York. Case transferred via. CM/ECF extraction. (DLB) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/7/2017.]
December 5, 2017 Filing 19 TRANSFER ORDER W/SCHEDULE A ATTACHED / CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Signed by MDL on 12/5/17. (CLA) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/7/2017.]
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #17 Joint MOTION to Stay by Defendant Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Rankin, W.) filed by Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED JCH. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 8/17/17. (CLA) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/7/2017.]
August 16, 2017 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Stay by Defendant Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Rankin, W.) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/7/2017.]
August 16, 2017 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #15 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to the Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis filed by Plaintiffs Dina Abbott, Miles Abbott, Kiesha Allen, Pamela Barlow, Andrea F. Benthusen, Donald L. Benthusen, Lisa Collins, Rachel Coughanour, Alice M. Dishong, Jeffrey Dishong, Melissa Gooch, Rober Gooch, Allen Goughanour, Beatrice L. Griner, Larry Griner, Shauna N. Guenther, Jamie Lee Harris, Willie D. McLead, Lakeisha R. McLeod, Danielle J. Melnyk, Glenn Melnyk, Frederick Mullins, Kareem Saunders, Lanika R. Saunders, Jennifer R. Widmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Remand Order of February 20, 2014, #3 Exhibit 3 - Remand Order of April 22, 2014, #4 Exhibit 4 - Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit 5 - Defendant's Motion to Sever and Transfer)(Lumaghi, Laura) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/7/2017.]
August 16, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to the Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis by Plaintiffs Dina Abbott, Miles Abbott, Kiesha Allen, Pamela Barlow, Andrea F. Benthusen, Donald L. Benthusen, Lisa Collins, Rachel Coughanour, Alice M. Dishong, Jeffrey Dishong, Melissa Gooch, Rober Gooch, Allen Goughanour, Beatrice L. Griner, Larry Griner, Shauna N. Guenther, Jamie Lee Harris, Willie D. McLead, Lakeisha R. McLeod, Danielle J. Melnyk, Glenn Melnyk, Frederick Mullins, Kareem Saunders, Lanika R. Saunders, Jennifer R. Widmer. (Lumaghi, Laura) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/7/2017.]
August 10, 2017 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Gregory J. Pals for Plaintiffs Dina Abbott, Miles Abbott, Kiesha Allen, Pamela Barlow, Andrea F. Benthusen, Donald L. Benthusen, Lisa Collins, Rachel Coughanour, Alice M. Dishong, Jeffrey Dishong, Melissa Gooch, Rober Gooch, Allen Goughanour, Beatrice L. Griner, Larry Griner, Shauna N. Guenther, Jamie Lee Harris, Willie D. McLead, Lakeisha R. McLeod, Danielle J. Melnyk, Glenn Melnyk, Frederick Mullins, Kareem Saunders, Lanika R. Saunders, Jennifer R. Widmer. (Pals, Gregory) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/7/2017.]
August 9, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Out-Of-State Plaintiffs by Plaintiffs Dina Abbott, Miles Abbott, Kiesha Allen, Pamela Barlow, Andrea F. Benthusen, Donald L. Benthusen, Lisa Collins, Rachel Coughanour, Alice M. Dishong, Jeffrey Dishong, Melissa Gooch, Rober Gooch, Allen Goughanour, Beatrice L. Griner, Larry Griner, Shauna N. Guenther, Jamie Lee Harris, Willie D. McLead, Lakeisha R. McLeod, Danielle J. Melnyk, Glenn Melnyk, Frederick Mullins, Kareem Saunders, Lanika R. Saunders, Jennifer R. Widmer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lumaghi, Laura) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/7/2017.]
August 9, 2017 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Laura Greene Lumaghi for Plaintiffs Dina Abbott, Miles Abbott, Kiesha Allen, Pamela Barlow, Andrea F. Benthusen, Donald L. Benthusen, Lisa Collins, Rachel Coughanour, Alice M. Dishong, Jeffrey Dishong, Melissa Gooch, Rober Gooch, Allen Goughanour, Beatrice L. Griner, Larry Griner, Shauna N. Guenther, Jamie Lee Harris, Willie D. McLead, Lakeisha R. McLeod, Danielle J. Melnyk, Glenn Melnyk, Frederick Mullins, Kareem Saunders, Lanika R. Saunders, Jennifer R. Widmer. (Lumaghi, Laura) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/7/2017.]
July 26, 2017 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Out-Of-State Plaintiffs filed by Defendant Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Rankin, W.) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/7/2017.]
July 26, 2017 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Out-Of-State Plaintiffs by Defendant Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Rankin, W.) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/7/2017.]
July 24, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Rankin, W.) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/7/2017.]
July 21, 2017 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Jean C. Hamilton. (BAK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/7/2017.]
July 21, 2017 Filing 8 Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Willie D. McLead, Alice M. Dishong, Frederick Mullins, Larry Griner, Pamela Barlow, Jeffrey Dishong, Kiesha Allen, Donald L. Benthusen, Jennifer R. Widmer, Kareem Saunders, Beatrice L. Griner, Glenn Melnyk, Jamie Lee Harris, Lisa Collins, Rachel Coughanour, Lanika R. Saunders, Dina Abbott, Miles Abbott, Shauna N. Guenther, Allen Goughanour, Melissa Gooch, Danielle J. Melnyk, Lakeisha R. McLeod, Andrea F. Benthusen, Rober Gooch.(BAK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/7/2017.]
July 21, 2017 Filing 7 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Frederick Mullins, Pamela Barlow, Kiesha Allen, Jamie Lee Harris, Lisa Collins, Melissa Gooch, Rober Gooch.(BAK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/7/2017.]
July 20, 2017 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION to Stay filed by Defendant Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rankin, W.) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/7/2017.]
July 20, 2017 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay by Defendant Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Rankin, W.) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/7/2017.]
July 19, 2017 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc... (Rankin, W.) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/7/2017.]
July 19, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Removal)(Rankin, W.) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/7/2017.]
July 19, 2017 Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, Sealed State Court File by Defendant Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Rankin, W.) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/7/2017.]
July 19, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from City of St. Louis, case number 1322-CC00276-02, with receipt number 0865-6059046, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Original Filing Form)(Rankin, W.) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 12/7/2017.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen et al v. Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Griner
Represented By: Gregory J Pals
Represented By: Laura Greene Lumaghi
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shauna N. Guenther
Represented By: Gregory J Pals
Represented By: Laura Greene Lumaghi
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea F. Benthusen
Represented By: Gregory J Pals
Represented By: Laura Greene Lumaghi
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald L. Benthusen
Represented By: Gregory J Pals
Represented By: Laura Greene Lumaghi
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Goughanour
Represented By: Gregory J Pals
Represented By: Laura Greene Lumaghi
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kareem Saunders
Represented By: Gregory J Pals
Represented By: Laura Greene Lumaghi
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dina Abbott
Represented By: Gregory J Pals
Represented By: Laura Greene Lumaghi
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rober Gooch
Represented By: Gregory J Pals
Represented By: Laura Greene Lumaghi
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Collins
Represented By: Gregory J Pals
Represented By: Laura Greene Lumaghi
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie D. McLead
Represented By: Gregory J Pals
Represented By: Laura Greene Lumaghi
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miles Abbott
Represented By: Gregory J Pals
Represented By: Laura Greene Lumaghi
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Lee Harris
Represented By: Gregory J Pals
Represented By: Laura Greene Lumaghi
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Barlow
Represented By: Gregory J Pals
Represented By: Laura Greene Lumaghi
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle J. Melnyk
Represented By: Gregory J Pals
Represented By: Laura Greene Lumaghi
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Mullins
Represented By: Gregory J Pals
Represented By: Laura Greene Lumaghi
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Melnyk
Represented By: Gregory J Pals
Represented By: Laura Greene Lumaghi
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Dishong
Represented By: Gregory J Pals
Represented By: Laura Greene Lumaghi
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatrice L. Griner
Represented By: Gregory J Pals
Represented By: Laura Greene Lumaghi
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lanika R. Saunders
Represented By: Gregory J Pals
Represented By: Laura Greene Lumaghi
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiesha Allen
Represented By: Gregory J Pals
Represented By: Laura Greene Lumaghi
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Coughanour
Represented By: Gregory J Pals
Represented By: Laura Greene Lumaghi
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakeisha R. McLeod
Represented By: Gregory J Pals
Represented By: Laura Greene Lumaghi
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer R. Widmer
Represented By: Gregory J Pals
Represented By: Laura Greene Lumaghi
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice M. Dishong
Represented By: Gregory J Pals
Represented By: Laura Greene Lumaghi
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Gooch
Represented By: Gregory J Pals
Represented By: Laura Greene Lumaghi
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: W. Jason Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?