99 Wall Development Inc. v. Allied World Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: 99 Wall Development Inc.
Defendant: Allied World Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 7:2018cv00126
Filed: January 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER. In light of the COVID-19 crisis, the Court will not hold the upcoming conference in this case in person. Counsel should still submit their joint letter by July 3, 2020, as directed in the Court's April 29, 2020 Order. See Dkt. 186. In their joint letter, the parties should also indicate whether they can do without a conference altogether. If not, the Court will hold the post-discovery conference by telephone. In any event, counsel should review and comply with the Court's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in Light of COVID-19, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-ronnie-abrams. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/1/20) (yv)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 OPINION AND ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL re: 182 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Produce filed by Allied World Specialty Insurance Company. For the reasons set forth above, Allied World's motion is gran ted in part and denied in part. 99 Wall shall re-review its privilege log and produce documents in whole or in a redacted format consistent with this decision. The Court attaches a chart with its rulings as to specific documents in the sample. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 5/26/2020) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (mro)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER: In light of the extension of the discovery deadline from March 31, 2020 to April 30, 2020, see Dkt. 176, the post-discovery conference scheduled for April 10, 2020 is hereby adjourned to May 8, 2020 at 12:30 p.m. In advance of the conference, the Court will notify the parties whether it will be held in person or by phone. No later than May 1, 2020, the parties shall submit a joint letter updating the Court on the status of the case, including but not limited to whether either party intends to file a dispositive motion and what efforts the parties have made to settle the action. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/1/2020) (rj)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER: For the telephonic conference currently scheduled for April 8, 2020, the parties are directed to call into the Court conference line at (866) 434-5269, Code: 4858267 at the appropriate time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 3/16/2020) (ama)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting 173 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Status Conference in this matter that is scheduled for Monday, March 16, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 is hereby converted to a telephonic conference and rescheduled to Wednesday, April 8, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for the parties are directed to call Judge Parker's Chambers at the scheduled time with counsel for all parties on the line. Please dial 212-805-0234. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 3/11/2020) Telephone Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (ks)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER denying without prejudice 167 Motion to Compel; denying without prejudice 168 Motion for Discovery. For the reasons set forth on the record during the December 18, 2018 telephone conference, the motions at ECF 167 and 168 are denied without prejudice as premature. The parties are directed to conduct the deposition of Plaintiffs expert within the next 30 days and to meet and confer further about documents on Plaintiff's privilege log and any potentially outstanding produ ction from Plaintiff based on its counsel's further inquiry as to location of communications with outside consultants. A status conference in this matter is hereby scheduled for March 16, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 17-D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 1/21/2020) (ks)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 OPINION & ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL: For the reasons set forth above, 99 Wall's motion is granted in part and denied in part. Allied shall produce the documents on its log by June 21, 2019, consistent with the above. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 6/14/2019) (rro)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 OPINION AND ORDER re: 108 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct For Leave to File Amended Intervenor-Complaint. filed by T.G. Nickel & Associates LLC. For the reasons set forth above, Defendants Motion to Amend is GRANTED. The Clerk is respectfully requested to terminate the motion at ECF 40. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 5/17/2019) (ks)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 99 Wall Development Inc. v. Allied World Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 99 Wall Development Inc.
Represented By: Phillip Perez
Represented By: Tracy Alan Saxe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied World Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew Luis Gonzalez
Represented By: Isabella Karlina Stankowski-Booker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?