Balchem Corporation et al v. Edwards et al
Plaintiff: Balchem Corporation and Albion Laboratories, Inc.
Defendant: Daniel Todd Edwards and Mil Agro, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2018cv02677
Filed: March 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: White Plains Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M. Karas
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1836
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL granting 200 Letter Motion to Seal. Having considered the Motion to Seal the original, un-redacted Transcript of the June 2, 2021 Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing ("Transcript"), and good cause appearin g therefore, the Court Orders that the original, un-redacted Transcript of the June 2, 2021 Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing be sealed. The Transcript shall remain sealed until further order of the Court. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully requested to terminate the pending Motion. (Dkt. No. 200.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/22/2021) (rro)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER denying 123 Letter Motion for Conference re: 123 LETTER MOTION for Conference for Leave to Amend Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Michael R. Gottfried dated January 25, 2019., 135 LETTER MOTION to Co mpel Balchem Corporation et al to to Respond to Revised Interrogatories addressed to Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy from Larry R. Laycock dated September 4, 2019., 163 MOTION for C.J. Veverka to Withdraw as Attorney ., [ 164] MOTION for Alexis K. Juergens to Withdraw as Attorney ., 174 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted)., 184 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal ., 193 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Response to Balch em's Summary Judgment Sur-reply addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from C.J. Veverka dated 4/3/2020. ; terminating 135 Letter Motion to Compel; terminating 163 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ; terminating 164 Motion to With draw as Attorney. ; granting in part and denying in part 174 Motion for Summary Judgment; terminating 184 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document; terminating 193 Letter Motion for Leave to File DocumentFor the reasons explained on the re cord at Oral Argument on June 2, 2021, Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment, (Dkt. No. 174), is granted insofar as it relates to the following claims: (1) Plaintiffs' claim that Defendants misappropriated Plaintiffs' trade secret of one of their customers, as discussed at Oral Argument; and (2) Plaintiffs' claim that Defendants violated the Lanham Act by advertising a particular aspect of their products, as discussed at Oral Argument. Otherwise, Defendants' Motion is denied, provided that Plaintiffs submit a translation of Exhibit 70 by June 16, 2021. Plaintiffs may file this exhibit under seal. For the reasons explained on the record at Oral Argument on June 2, 2021, Plaintiffs' Motion To Amend, (Dkt. No. 123), is denied insofar as Plaintiffs seek to base their claim on Edwards's knowledge of information that was public or derivative of public information. Otherwise, Plaintiffs' Motion is granted. Plaintiffs must submit their Second Amended Complaint by June 16, 2021. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the pending Motions. (Dkt. Nos. 123, 135, 163, 164, 174, 184, 193.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 6/3/2021) (rro)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 198 NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION. For the week of June 1, 2021, the Court will hold all civil conferences, hearings, and/or oral arguments by telephone. Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA t oll-free): (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 7702195. Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign (#). Given that much of the Court is operating remotely and has limited mail capability, counsel involved in any pro se cases shall mail a copy of this Notice to or otherwise inform the pro se party of the above teleconference information. Counsel in any pro se inmate cases shall ensure that the pro se party is on the line before calling the above-referenced number. For initial conferences, counsel shall submit a proposed case management and discovery schedule via ECF by 5 p.m. on the evening before the initial conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/28/21) (yv)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 197 CALENDAR NOTICE, Please take notice that the above captioned action has been scheduled for oral argument on the pending Motion For Summary Judgment, (Dkt. No. 174), before the Honorable Kenneth M. Karas, United States District Judge, on Wednesday, June 2, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. NOTICE OF TELECONFERENCE INFORMATION: The Court will hold all civil conferences, hearings, and/or oral arguments by telephone. Counsel shall call the following number at the designated time: Meeting Dial-In Number (USA toll -free): (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 7702195. Please enter the conference as a guest by pressing the pound sign(#). Any requests for adjournments should be filed as soon as possible and clearly explain why the conference should be adjourned. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 6/2/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 5/11/21) (yv)
April 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL granting 191 Letter Motion to Seal. Plaintiffs may file Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 190) under seal. These documents shall remain sealed until further order of the Court or until the conclusion of this litigation, at which time the clerk's office will return the sealed documents to Plaintiffs' counsel of record. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 4/3/20) (yv)
March 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting 186 Motion for file under seal. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/14/20) (yv)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: granting 175 MOTION to Seal Document 174 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted). ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 1/7/2020) (jca)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balchem Corporation et al v. Edwards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Balchem Corporation
Represented By: Christina Joy F. Grese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albion Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Christina Joy F. Grese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Todd Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mil Agro, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?