Heritage Hills Society, Ltd. v. Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Heritage Hills Society, Ltd.
Defendant: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Case Number: 7:2018cv07095
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332in
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. The Court having been advised that all claims asserted herein have been settled, it is ORDERED, that the above-entitled action be and hereby is discontinued, without costs to either party, subject to reopening should the settlement not be consummated within forty-five (45) days of the date hereof. The Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled for October 12, 2018 is cancelled. The parties are advised that if they wish the Court to retain jurisdiction in this matter for purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court within the next 45 days with a request that the agreement be "so ordered" by the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 9/28/2018) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (rjm)
September 28, 2018 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from lance J. Kalik dated September 28, 2018 re: Advising Court of Settlement. Document filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company.(Kalik, Lance)
September 6, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: THIS MATTER HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR AN INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, on October 12, 2018 at 11:00 am, at the United States Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, Courtroom 218, White Plains, New York 10601. PLAINTIFF, OR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF(S) SHALL NOTIFY ALL PARTIES IN WRITING AND PROVIDE ALL PARTIES WITH A COPY OF THIS NOTICE AND THE ATTACHED CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER, UNLESS THE CASE HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM STATE COURT, IN WHICH EVENT COUNSEL FOR THE REMOVING DEFENDANT(S) SHALL PROVIDE SUCH NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES. Initial Conference set for 10/12/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 218, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. (ama)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT ORDER: ORDERED that the Harleysville's time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended to September 28, 2018.No further extensions. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED., Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company answer due 9/28/2018. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 9/06/2018) (ama)
September 5, 2018 Filing 10 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER. Document filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Kalik, Lance)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT ORDER: ORDERED that the Harleysville's time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended to September 7, 2018. SO ORDERED. Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company answer due 9/7/2018. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 8/16/2018) (mml)
August 9, 2018 Filing 8 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER. Document filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Kalik, Lance)
August 9, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Evan Agulnick on behalf of Heritage Hills Society, Ltd.. (Agulnick, Scott)
August 8, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance with Jury Demand. Document filed by Heritage Hills Society, Ltd.. (Agulnick, Scott)
August 8, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kalik, Lance)
August 8, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Westchester. Case Number: 59867/2018. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15422934).Document filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit Notice of Service of Process)(Kalik, Lance)
August 8, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 8, 2018 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
August 8, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
August 8, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lance Jon Kalik. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Office code Foley Square; Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Jury Demand code p (Plaintiff); Dollar Demand $125000000; County code Westchester;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Office code has been modified to White Plains; the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Jury Demand code has been modified to d (Defendant); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $125000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
August 8, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Lance Jon Kalik. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet separately. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
August 8, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Lance Jon Kalik to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Pursuant to Rule 13.3, exhibits to Notice of Removals are to be separate attachments to pleading and labeled (i.e. Summons and Complaint). Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on Heritage Hills Society, LTD. on 8/7/2018. Service was made by Email. Document filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Kalik, Lance)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Ins. Co., Corporate Parent Harleysville Group, Inc for Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. Document filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company.(Kalik, Lance)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 59867-2018. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15418701).Document filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kalik, Lance) Modified on 8/8/2018 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heritage Hills Society, Ltd. v. Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Represented By: Lance Jon Kalik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heritage Hills Society, Ltd.
Represented By: Scott Evan Agulnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?