Joseph v. Annucci et al
Plaintiff: Rodney Joseph
Defendant: Gail Williams, Lane Kortright, Samuel Encarnacion, Stainislaus Ogbonna, Angelo Justiniano, Corey Proscia, Joseph Maxwell, Edward Burnett, Frank Decker, Swany Reid, William Keyser, Anthony Annucci, Mathew Defrank, Colleen Bennett, Michael Wood, William Beach, Ginsin, Shaun Braisington, Ginger Eggler, S. T. Herman, David Jurgens, Janice Wolf, Edward Burnell, Adam Jarosz, Chester Stungis, Heather Wyatt, Alan Hanson, Joseph Frankie, Robert Depaolo, Renee Askew, Van Fuller, Wayne Jordan, Blain Reddish, Puerschner, Kevin Miller, Wladyslaw Sidorowicz, Christopher Conway, William Eleberth, Gina Maliga, Scott Christie, Tanya Pomeroy, Kellyanne Giminiani, Epifanio Tolentio and Jefrysson Aldana
Case Number: 7:2018cv07197
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Mailed a copy of #14 Valentin Order, to NYC Law Dept. 100 Church Street New York NY 10007 by Certified Mail # 7017 3040 0000 9027 8363 with Return Receipt Requested. (vba)
October 5, 2018 Mailed a copy of #14 Valentin Order, to Rodney Joseph 97-A-4976 Sullivan Correctional Facility 325 Riverside Drive P.O. Box 116 Fallsburg, NY 12733-0116; NYS Attorney General's Office 28 Liberty Street New York NY 10005. (vba)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 VALENTIN ORDER: It is therefore ordered that the New York State Attorney General's Office ("NYS AG"), located at 28 Libe1ty St., New York, NY 10005, ascertain the correct identity and address for Defendants: Edward Burnell, Alan Hanson, Ginsin, Puerschner, and S. T. Herman in order to facilitate se1vice of the Complaint. The NYS AG shall provide this information to Plaintiff and the Court within thirty days of the date of this order. Upon receipt of this information, the Court will issue an order directing the Clerk of the Court to send instructions to Plaintiff to effect service on the proper defendants in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to the NYS AG at the address above and to Plaintiff at the address listed on ECF and show proof of such service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 10/4/2018) (anc) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 27, 2018 Filing 13 MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to S. T. Herman. Attempted Service of Summons and Complaint. Service was attempted on 9/26/18. Document filed by Rodney Joseph. (sc)
September 27, 2018 Filing 12 MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to Puerschner. Attempted Service of Summons and Complaint. Service was attempted on 9/26/18. Document filed by Rodney Joseph. (sc)
September 27, 2018 Filing 11 MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to Ginsin. Attempted Service of Summons and Complaint. Service was attempted on 9/26/18. Document filed by Rodney Joseph. (sc)
September 27, 2018 Filing 10 MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to Alan Hanson. Attempted Service of Summons and Complaint. Service was attempted on 9/26/18. Document filed by Rodney Joseph. (sc)
September 27, 2018 Filing 9 MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to Edward Burnell. Attempted Service of Summons and Complaint. Service was attempted on 9/26/18. Document filed by Rodney Joseph. (sc)
September 24, 2018 Request for Copies/Transcripts/Docket Sheet Processed: Mailed copy of Docket Sheet to Rodney Joseph 97-A-4976 Sullivan Correctional Facility 325 Riverside Drive P.O. Box 116 Fallsburg, NY 12733-0116 on 9/24/2018. (nb)
September 21, 2018 Request for Copy of the updated Docket Sheet Received: Re #8 Letter. Request for Docket Report, from Rodney Joseph received on 9/21/18. Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
September 21, 2018 Filing 8 LETTER from Rodney Joseph, dated 9/13/18 re: Plaintiff informs the Court that he has not received a docket number nor any reply from the Clerk's Office indicating its reception of his documents. Document filed by Rodney Joseph.(sc)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE MAILED to Rodney Joseph 97-A-4976 Sullivan Correctional Facility 325 Riverside Drive P.O. Box 116 Fallsburg, NY 12733-0116, at, on 9/14/2018 Re: #6 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (nb)
September 14, 2018 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 9/14/2018 Re: Judge Nelson Stephen Roman #6 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for All Defendants. (nb)
September 14, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (nb)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for the 44 named defendants and deliver all documents necessary to effect service to the U.S. Marshals Service. Local Civil Rule 33.2 applies to this action. Within 120 days of service of the complaint, Defendants must serve responses to these standard discovery requests. In their responses, Defendants must quote each request verbatim. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore informa pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 9/13/2018) (anc)
September 12, 2018 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
September 12, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
September 10, 2018 Mailed a copy of #3 Prisoner Authorization to Rodney Joseph 97-A-4976 Sullivan Correctional Facility 325 Riverside Drive P.O. Box 116 Fallsburg, NY 12733-0116; The Superintendent Sullivan Correctional Facility 325 Riverside Drive P.O. Box 116 Fallsburg, NY 12733-0116. (vba)
September 6, 2018 Case Designated Local Rule 33.2. (ees)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/5/2018) (anc) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Rodney Joseph.(rdz)
August 7, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Anthony Annucci, Edward Burnett, Frank Decker, Samuel Encarnacion, Angelo Justiniano, William Keyser, Lane Kortright, Joseph Maxwell, Stainislaus Ogbonna, Corey Proscia, Swany Reid, Gail Williams, Jefrysson Aldana, Scott Christie, Ginger Eggler, Colleen Bennett, Tanya Pomeroy, Wladyslaw Sidorowicz, Janice Wolf, S. T. Herman, Wayne Jordan, Epifanio Tolentio, Kevin Miller, William Beach, Renee Askew, Michael Wood, Van Fuller, Alan Hanson, Gina Maliga, Heather Wyatt, William Eleberth, Kellyanne Giminiani, Christopher Conway, Blain Reddish, Puerschner, Ginsin, David Jurgens, Edward Burnell, Shaun Braisington, Joseph Frankie, Mathew Defrank, Chester Stungis, Robert Depaolo, Adam Jarosz. Document filed by Rodney Joseph.(rdz) Modified on 9/13/2018 (sac).
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Rodney Joseph.(rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph v. Annucci et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lane Kortright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Encarnacion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stainislaus Ogbonna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelo Justiniano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Proscia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swany Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Keyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Annucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathew Defrank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Beach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ginsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaun Braisington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ginger Eggler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. T. Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Jurgens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Burnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Jarosz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chester Stungis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Frankie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Depaolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Askew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blain Reddish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerschner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wladyslaw Sidorowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Eleberth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Maliga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Christie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Pomeroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellyanne Giminiani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epifanio Tolentio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefrysson Aldana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?