Walker v. Greystone Programs Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kerry Walker
Defendant: Denise Miranda, NYS Justice Center for the Protection of People with Special Needs, Lydia Roe, Sylvia Doe, Greystone Programs Inc. and Louis P. Renzi
Case Number: 7:2018cv07757
Filed: August 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981ra
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #1 Complaint, Pre-motion letter requesting conference in anticipation of motion to dismiss addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Jane R. Goldberg dated Oct. 26, 2018. Document filed by Denise Miranda, NYS Justice Center for the Protection of People with Special Needs, Louis P. Renzi.(Goldberg, Jane)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jane R. Goldberg on behalf of Denise Miranda, NYS Justice Center for the Protection of People with Special Needs, Louis P. Renzi. (Goldberg, Jane)
August 27, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
August 27, 2018 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
August 27, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
August 27, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael David Diederich, Jr.. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1331; County code Dutchess. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 42:1981; the County code has been modified to Orange. (sj)
August 27, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael David Diederich, Jr.. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Kerry Walker; Louis P. Renzi; Denise Miranda. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted. (sj)
August 26, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Diederich, Michael)
August 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sylvia Doe, Greystone Programs Inc., Denise Miranda, NYS Justice Center for the Protection of People with Special Needs, Louis Renzi, Lydia Roe. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15494316)Document filed by Kerry Ann Walker.(Diederich, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Greystone Programs Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Miranda
Represented By: Jane R. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYS Justice Center for the Protection of People with Special Needs
Represented By: Jane R. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lydia Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystone Programs Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis P. Renzi
Represented By: Jane R. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Walker
Represented By: Michael David Diederich, Jr.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?