Freedom Mortgage Corporation v. Pardillo
Plaintiff: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Defendant: Raymond M. Pardillo, III
Case Number: 7:2018cv07775
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332fc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Stephen J. Vargas in Support. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Non Military Affidavit)(Vargas, Stephen)
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Ruby J. Krajick in Support. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Vargas, Stephen)
October 2, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Raymond M. Pardillo, III served on 9/10/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. Service was accepted by Raymond M. Pardillo, III. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Vargas, Stephen)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Vargas, Stephen)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Raymond M. Pardillo, III. (pne)
August 28, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 28, 2018 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
August 28, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation.(Vargas, Stephen)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Raymond M. Pardillo, III, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Vargas, Stephen)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Vargas, Stephen)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Raymond M. Pardillo, III. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15495884)Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Merit pursuant to CPLR 3012-b)(Vargas, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freedom Mortgage Corporation v. Pardillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond M. Pardillo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Stephen John Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?