Pennicott v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Plaintiff: Marcia Pennicott
Defendant: Westchester County Sheriff's Department, Pelham Town Court, Westchester County, State of New York, Westchester County Executive Department, Federal National Mortgage Association and Westchester County Police
Case Number: 7:2018cv08298
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Referring Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Mailed a copy of #10 Order, to Marcia Pennicott P.O. Box 8225 Pelham, NY 10803. (aea)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Accordingly for the reasons stated in Doc. 6, Doc. 4 in No. 18-CV-6095, and Doc. 67 in No. 16-CV-3044 the Court hereby imposes a limited filing injunction barring Plaintiff from filing in this Court any new civil action arising from or directly related to either the foreclosure action or the holdover proceeding without prior leave of court. Should Plaintiff seek leave to file a new action covered by this limited filing injunction, she must attach a copy of this order and the proposed complaint to her motion seeking leave. The motion must be filed with the Pro Se Intake Unit of this Court. If Pennicott violates this Order and files an action without first filing a motion for leave to file, the Court will dismiss the action for failure to comply with this Order. Pennicott is further advised that the continued submission of duplicative filings may result in the imposition of additional sanctions, including monetary penalties. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk is respectfully directed send a copy of this Order to Plaintiff and to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 10/31/2018) (mml) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
October 30, 2018 Mailed a copy of #8 Order, to Marcia Pennicott P.O. Box 8225 Pelham, NY 10803. (aea)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Accordingly for the reasons stated in Doc. 6, Doc. 4 in No. 18-CV-6095, and Doc. 67 in No. 16-CV-3044 the Court hereby imposes a limited filing injunction barring Plaintiff from filing in this Court any new civil action arising from or directly related to either the foreclosure action or the holdover proceeding without prior leave of court. Should Plaintiff seek leave to file a new action covered by this limited filing injunction, she must attach a copy of this order and the proposed complaint to her motion seeking leave. The motion must be filed with the Pro Se Intake Unit of this Court. If Pennicott violates this Order and files an action without first filing a motion for leave to file, the Court will dismiss the action for failure to comply with this Order. Pennicott is further advised that the continued submission of duplicative filings may result in the imposition of additional sanctions, including monetary penalties. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk is respectfully directed send a copy of this Order to Plaintiff and to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 10/30/2018) (mml) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
October 25, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIRMATION of Marcia Pennicott TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE IMPOSITION OF A LIMITED FILING INJUNCTION BARRING PLAINTIFF FROM FILING IN THIS COURT ANY NEW CIVIL ACTION ARISING FROM PRIOR ACTIONS WITHOUT PRIOR LEAVE OR COURT IS UNCONSTITUTIONAL ; re: #6 Order to Show Cause. Document filed by Marcia Pennicott. (sc) (Main Document 9 replaced on 10/31/2018) (sc).
October 24, 2018 Filing 7 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Marcia Pennicott consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Marcia Pennicott.(sc)
October 5, 2018 Mailed a copy of #6 Order to Show Cause, to Marcia Pennicott 991 Grant Avenue Pelham, NY 10803. (aea)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE in writing, on or before October 25, 2018, why the Court should not impose a limited filing injunction barring Plaintiff from filing in this Court any new civil action arising from or directly related to either the foreclosure action or the holdover proceeding without prior leave of court. Failure to show cause will result in the imposition of a limited filing injunction. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, noting service on the docket. All unpublished cases will be mailed to the Plaintiff. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 10/4/2018) (ne) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 14, 2018 Mailed copy of the Pro Se letter for assignment/reassignment to Marcia Pennicott at 991 Grant Avenue Pelham, NY 10803 on 9/14/2018. (wb)
September 14, 2018 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so redesignated. (wb)
September 14, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Cathy Seibel. Judge Ronnie Abrams is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
September 12, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Marcia Pennicott dated 9/12/2018 re: Emergency Rights Violated. Document filed by Marcia Pennicott.(sac)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4 UNSIGNED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Marcia Pennicott. (sac)
September 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Westchester County Sheriff's Department. (sj)
September 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Westchester County Police. (sj)
September 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Westchester County Executive Department. (sj)
September 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pelham Town Court, Westchester County, State of New York. (sj)
September 12, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal National Mortgage Association. (sj)
September 12, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
September 12, 2018 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (sj)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal National Mortgage Association, Pelham Town Court, Westchester County, State of New York, Westchester County Executive Department, Westchester County Police, Westchester County Sheriff's Department. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465407016324)Document filed by Marcia Pennicott.(sj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pennicott v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Pennicott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchester County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pelham Town Court, Westchester County, State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchester County Executive Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchester County Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?