U.S. Bank National Association v. Haskins
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Adjustable Rate Mortgage Loan Trust, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-23 and U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: Walter D. Haskins
Case Number: 7:2018cv08478
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332ej
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to #10 Counterclaim. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Adjustable Rate Mortgage Loan Trust, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-23. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Eyet, Matthew)
October 23, 2018 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank National Association, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Adjustable Rate Mortgage Loan Trust, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-23. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Adjustable Rate Mortgage Loan Trust, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-23. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Eyet, Matthew)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COUNTERCLAIMS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned attorneys for the patties that the time within which Plaintiff, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Adjustable Rate Mortgage Loan Trust, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-23, may respond to the Defendant's counterclaims is hereby extended through and until Wednesday, October 24, 2018. SO ORDERED. U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Adjustable Rate Mortgage Loan Trust, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-23 answer due 10/24/2018. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/11/2018) (mml)
October 10, 2018 Filing 14 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Adjustable Rate Mortgage Loan Trust, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-23. (Eyet, Matthew)
October 10, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Travis Eyet on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Adjustable Rate Mortgage Loan Trust, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-23. (Eyet, Matthew)
September 26, 2018 Filing 12 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Svensson, Paul)
September 25, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
September 25, 2018 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (vf)
September 25, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (vf)
September 25, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Paul Edward Svensson. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
September 20, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 60918/2018..Document filed by Walter D. Haskins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Svensson, Paul)
September 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Paul Edward Svensson to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Petition (Other),. The filing is deficient for the following reason: the wrong event type was used to file the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 9/24/2018. (pne)
September 19, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Adjustable Rate Mortgage Loan Trust, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-23. Document filed by Walter D. Haskins.(Svensson, Paul)
September 19, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Answer and Counterclaims served on U.S. Bank National Association on 9/19/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Walter D. Haskins. (Svensson, Paul)
September 19, 2018 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #10 Answer) - ANSWER to Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Walter D. Haskins. Document filed by Walter D. Haskins.(Svensson, Paul) Modified on 9/19/2018 (db).
September 19, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Rule 7.1 Disclosure served on U.S. Bank National Association on 9/19/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Walter D. Haskins. (Svensson, Paul)
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Walter D. Haskins.(Svensson, Paul)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Demand for Jury Trial served on U.S. Bank National Association on 09/18/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Walter D. Haskins. (Svensson, Paul)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Walter D. Haskins(Svensson, Paul)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Petition, Petition for Removal and Supporting Exhibits served on U.S. Bank National Association on 9/18/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Walter D. Haskins. (Svensson, Paul)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - PETITION REMOVAL..Document filed by Walter D. Haskins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Supplement Aff Svc and Efiling of Notice of Removal)(Svensson, Paul) Modified on 9/19/2018 (pne).
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - PETITION REMOVAL. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15584038).Document filed by Walter D. Haskins.(Svensson, Paul) Modified on 9/19/2018 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. Haskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Adjustable Rate Mortgage Loan Trust, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-23
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Matthew Travis Eyet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter D. Haskins
Represented By: Paul Edward Svensson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?