U.S. Bank National Association v. Cercena et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A. and Catherine A. Cercena
Case Number: 7:2018cv08809
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: White Plains Office
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332fc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Vargas, Stephen)
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. served on 10/2/2018, answer due 10/23/2018. Service was accepted by Bridget Lamb, Regulatory Operation Officer. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Vargas, Stephen)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Catherine A. Cercena, HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. (pc)
September 27, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 27, 2018 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
September 27, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank National Association. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association.(Vargas, Stephen)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Catherine A. Cercena; HSBC Bank USA, N.A., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Vargas, Stephen)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Vargas, Stephen)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Catherine A. Cercena, HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15619805)Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Merit pursuant to CPLR 3012-b)(Vargas, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. Cercena et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Stephen John Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine A. Cercena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?