Peak Enterprises, Inc. v. Monument Construction, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Peak Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Western Surety Company and Monument Construction, LLC
Case Number: 7:2018cv08846
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: White Plains Office
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Western Surety Company served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018. Service was accepted by Chris Lowbitowski, Legal Coordinator. Document filed by Peak Enterprises, Inc.. (Kemp, Sean)
October 30, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Monument Construction, LLC served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. Service was accepted by Peter Tatronis, Managing Agent. Document filed by Peak Enterprises, Inc.. (Kemp, Sean)
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Monument Construction, LLC. (pc)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Western Surety Company. (pc)
September 27, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 27, 2018 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
September 27, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
September 27, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Sean M. Kemp. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1352; Dollar Demand $85,000; County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1331; the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the County code has been modified to Dutchess. (pc)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kemp, Sean)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Peak Enterprises, Inc..(Kemp, Sean)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Western Surety Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Peak Enterprises, Inc.. (Kemp, Sean)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Monument Construction, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Peak Enterprises, Inc.. (Kemp, Sean)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monument Construction, LLC, Western Surety Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15623618)Document filed by Peak Enterprises, Inc..(Kemp, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peak Enterprises, Inc. v. Monument Construction, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peak Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Sean M. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monument Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?