Santana v. Dobbs Ferry Police Department et al

Plaintiff: Fernando Santana
Defendant: Dobbs Ferry Police Department, Police Officer John Doe 1, Police Officer John Doe 2, Police Officer John Doe 3 and Police Officer John Doe 4
Case Number: 7:2018cv10321
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: New York Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2019 8 Featured Case FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE MAILED to Fernando Santana, at 2759 Webster Ave. Bronx, NY 10458, on 1/3/2019 Re: #7 Order of Service via REGULAR MAIL. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases). (bwa)
January 3, 2019 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 1/3/2019 Re: Judge Kenneth M. Karas #7 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s)Village of Dobbs Ferry. (bwa)
January 3, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Village of Dobbs Ferry. (bwa)
January 3, 2019 7 Featured Case ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Court dismisses Plaintiff's claims against the Dobbs Ferry Police Department. See 28 U.S.C. l 915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The Clerk of Court is directed to add the Village of Dobbs Ferry as a Defendant under Fed. R. Civ. P. 21. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to issue a summons and complete the USM-285 form with the address for the Village of Dobbs Ferry and deliver all documents necessary to effect service to the U.S. Marshals Service. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order and the Complaint to the Village of Dobbs Ferry at: 112 Main Street, Dobbs Ferry, New York 10522. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. l 915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/28/2018) (jca) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
December 14, 2018 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
December 14, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
December 6, 2018 5 PRO SE MEMORANDUM, re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Fernando Santana. New Address: 2759 Webster Ave., Bronx, New York, 10458. (sc)
November 9, 2018 Mailed a copy of #4 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case, to Fernando Santana ID No. 253724 Westchester County Jail 10 Woods Road P.O Box 10 Valhalla, NY 10595; The Superintendent Westchester County Jail 10 Woods Road P.O Box 10 Valhalla, NY 10595. (vba)
November 8, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees is granted. A prisoner bringing a civil action is required to pay the full $350 filing fee even when proceeding in forma pauperis (IFP), that is, without prepayment of fees.... The Court must collect, when funds exist in a prisoner's account, an initial partial filing fee plus monthly payments. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/8/2018) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 5, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (ks)
November 5, 2018 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Fernando Santana. (ks)
November 5, 2018 2 COMPLAINT against Dobbs Ferry Police Department, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3, John Doe 4. Document filed by Fernando Santana. (ks)
November 5, 2018 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Fernando Santana. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santana v. Dobbs Ferry Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Santana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dobbs Ferry Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer John Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer John Doe 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?