Griffin v. Annucci et al

Plaintiff: Rudolph W. Griffin
Defendant: Dr. Valerie Monroe, Dr. Felix Ezekwe, Ms. Rowah Rosario, Frank Corso, Michael Capra and Anthony Annucci
Case Number: 7:2018cv10405
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: New York Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2018 9 Featured Case FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE MAILED to Rudolph W. Griffin ID No. 05-B-3221 Green Haven Correctional Facility 594 Rt. 216 Stormville, NY 12582, at, on 12/20/2018 Re: #8 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (nb)
December 20, 2018 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 12/20/2018 Re: Judge Kenneth M. Karas #8 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s) Anthony Annucci, Michael Capra, Frank Corso, Felix Ezekwe, Valerie Monroe, Rowah Rosario. (nb)
December 20, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anthony Annucci, Michael Capra, Frank Corso, Felix Ezekwe, Valerie Monroe, Rowah Rosario. (nb)
December 19, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for Anthony Annucci, Acting Commissioner of Corrections; Michael Capra, Shield # 00101, Superintendent of Sing Sing Correctional Facility; Dr. Felix Ezekwe, Shield # 30402; Dr. Valerie Monroe, Shield# 30415; Pharmacist Frank Corso, Shield# 31802; and Ms. Rowah Rosario, Shield # 30708, Registered Nurse, and deliver all documents necessary to effect service to the U.S. Marshals Service. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauper is status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 44-5 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 12/19/2018) (jca)
December 18, 2018 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
December 18, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
December 14, 2018 Mailed a copy of #6 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case, to Rudolph W. Griffin ID No. 05-B-3221 Green Haven Correctional Facility 594 Rt. 216 Stormville, NY 12582; The Superintendent Green Haven Correctional Facility 594 Rt. 216 Stormville, NY 12582. (vba)
December 13, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/13/2018) (anc) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 8, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (ks)
November 8, 2018 5 DECLARATION in Support of claim that complaint was timely filed. Document filed by Rudolph W. Griffin. (ks)
November 8, 2018 4 MEMORANDUM OF LAW. Document filed by Rudolph W. Griffin. (ks)
November 8, 2018 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Rudolph W. Griffin. (ks) (ks).
November 8, 2018 2 COMPLAINT against Anthony Annucci, Michael Capra, Frank Corso, Felix Ezekwe, Valerie Monroe, Rowah Rosario. Document filed by Rudolph W. Griffin. (ks)
November 8, 2018 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Rudolph W. Griffin. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Annucci et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Valerie Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Felix Ezekwe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Rowah Rosario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Corso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Capra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Annucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudolph W. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?