Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. La Bohemia Restaurant Bar Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: La Bohemia Restaurant Bar Corp. and Rafael R. Delacruz
Case Number: 7:2018cv10422
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 12 AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Rafael R. Delacruz, La Bohemia Restaurant Bar Corp..(DeMarco, Mario)
December 18, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - PDF ERROR. Notice to Attorney Mario Louis DeMarco to RE-FILE Document #10 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. (lb)
December 17, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/17/2019 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 621, Charles L. Brieant United States Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel. (mro)
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Rafael R. Delacruz, La Bohemia Restaurant Bar Corp..(DeMarco, Mario) Modified on 12/18/2018 (lb).
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rafael R. Delacruz, La Bohemia Restaurant Bar Corp..(DeMarco, Mario)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Rafael R. Delacruz served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018; La Bohemia Restaurant Bar Corp. served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. Service was accepted by Denise Blanco, Employee. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Jekielek, Jon)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to La Bohemia Restaurant Bar Corp.. (sj)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rafael R. Delacruz. (sj)
November 13, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 13, 2018 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
November 13, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rafael R. Delacruz, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Jekielek, Jon)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to La Bohemia Restaurant Bar Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Jekielek, Jon)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc..(Jekielek, Jon)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Jekielek, Jon)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rafael R. Delacruz, La Bohemia Restaurant Bar Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15890583)Document filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc..(Jekielek, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. La Bohemia Restaurant Bar Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Bohemia Restaurant Bar Corp.
Represented By: Mario Louis DeMarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael R. Delacruz
Represented By: Mario Louis DeMarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jon Damon Jekielek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?