Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Los Tigres Restaurant Co., Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Los Tigres Restaurant Co., Inc., Jose Arturo Zhishpon and Maria Luisa Zhishpon-Vivar
Case Number: 7:2018cv10425
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:605
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 16 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Los Tigres Restaurant Co., Inc. d/b/a Los Tigres Restaurant, Jose Arturo Zhishpon, and Maria Luisa Zhishpon-Vivar. (km)
December 20, 2018 Filing 15 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Jekielek, Jon) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
December 20, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: Notice to Attorney Jon Jekielek. RE-FILE Document No. #13 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Please refer to ECF Rule 16.1. The request to enter default is no longer needed. Re-file the proposed clerk's certificate as one entry, then file the affidavit in support as a separate entry. (Filed under other answers, affidavit in support of a non-motion). (km)
December 20, 2018 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Jon D. Jekielek in Support re: #13 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,. Document filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Jekielek, Jon)
December 20, 2018 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Default) (Jekielek, Jon) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 12/20/2018 (km).
December 20, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Jon Damon Jekielek to RE-FILE Document #12 Declaration in Support of Motion. Use the event type Declaration in Support (non-motion) found under the event list Other Answers, then link to Proposed Order when refiled. (db)
December 20, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Jon Damon Jekielek to RE-FILE Document #11 FIRST MOTION for Entry of Default as to Los Tigres Restaurant Co., Inc., Jose Arturo Zhishpon, and Maria Luisa Zhishpon-Vivar . Use the event type Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default found under the event list Proposed Orders. (db)
December 19, 2018 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - DECLARATION of Jon D. Jekielek in Support re: #11 FIRST MOTION for Entry of Default as to Los Tigres Restaurant Co., Inc., Jose Arturo Zhishpon, and Maria Luisa Zhishpon-Vivar .. Document filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Jekielek, Jon) Modified on 12/20/2018 (db).
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - FIRST MOTION for Entry of Default as to Los Tigres Restaurant Co., Inc., Jose Arturo Zhishpon, and Maria Luisa Zhishpon-Vivar . Document filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Default)(Jekielek, Jon) Modified on 12/20/2018 (db).
November 27, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Los Tigres Restaurant Co., Inc. served on 11/17/2018, answer due 12/10/2018; Jose Arturo Zhishpon served on 11/17/2018, answer due 12/10/2018; Maria Luisa Zhishpon-Vivar served on 11/17/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. Service was accepted by Jane Doe, Employee. Document filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Jekielek, Jon)
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Maria Luisa Zhishpon-Vivar. (dnh)
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jose Arturo Zhishpon. (dnh)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Los Tigres Restaurant Co., Inc.. (dnh)
November 13, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 13, 2018 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
November 13, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Maria Luisa Zhishpon-Vivar, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Jekielek, Jon)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jose Arturo Zhishpon, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Jekielek, Jon)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Los Tigres Restaurant Co., Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Jekielek, Jon)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc..(Jekielek, Jon)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Jekielek, Jon)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Los Tigres Restaurant Co., Inc., Jose Arturo Zhishpon, Maria Luisa Zhishpon-Vivar. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15891183)Document filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc..(Jekielek, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Los Tigres Restaurant Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Tigres Restaurant Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Arturo Zhishpon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Luisa Zhishpon-Vivar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jon Damon Jekielek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?