Griffith-Fenton v. JP Morgan Chase N.A.
Plaintiff: Beverley Griffith-Fenton
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase N.A.
Case Number: 7:2018cv11031
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), Notice to Pro Se Litigant Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 12.1, Memorandum of Law, along with copies of cases and other authorities cited therein that are unpublished or reported exclusively on computerized databases, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7.2, Declaration of Brian P. Scibetta, Esq served on BEVERLEY GRIFFITH-FENTON on 01/07/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by JP Morgan Chase N.A.. (Scibetta, Brian)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of to Pro Se Litigant Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 12.1 re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint with Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b) and 12(b)(6).. Document filed by JP Morgan Chase N.A.. (Scibetta, Brian)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint with Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b) and 12(b)(6). . Document filed by JP Morgan Chase N.A.. (Scibetta, Brian)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Brian P. Scibetta, Esq. in Support re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint with Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b) and 12(b)(6).. Document filed by JP Morgan Chase N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Scibetta, Brian)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint with Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b) and 12(b)(6). Document filed by JP Morgan Chase N.A..(Scibetta, Brian)
December 4, 2018 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so redesignated. (wb)
December 4, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Judge Gregory H. Woods is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
November 29, 2018 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ma)
November 29, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
November 29, 2018 CASE DECLINED AS NOT SIMILAR. Case referred as similar to 15cv4108 and declined by Judge Vincent Briccetti and returned to wheel for assignment. (ma)
November 27, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Vincent L. Briccetti as possibly similar to 7:15-cv-04108. (dnh)
November 27, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JP Morgan Chase N.A.. (dnh)
November 27, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (dnh)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JP Morgan Chase N.A.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465407016561)Document filed by Beverley Griffith-Fenton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(dnh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffith-Fenton v. JP Morgan Chase N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverley Griffith-Fenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase N.A.
Represented By: Brian Peter Scibetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?