Yorktown Jaz LLC v. Texaco Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Yorktown Jaz LLC
Defendant: Texaco Downstream Properties Inc., Chevron Environmental Management Company, TEXACO REFINING & MARKETING INC.;, TEXACO, INC.;, Texaco Inc. Inc., Texaco Refining and Marketing Inc. and Texaco Downstream
Case Number: 7:2018cv11186
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1446nr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Chevron Environmental Management Company, Texaco Downstream, Texaco Inc. Inc..(Cuonzo, Angelo)
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Texaco Downstream LLC for Texaco Downstream. Document filed by Texaco Downstream.(Cuonzo, Angelo)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Global Energy Inc. for Chevron Environmental Management Company. Document filed by Chevron Environmental Management Company.(Cuonzo, Angelo)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Investments Inc. for Texaco Inc. Inc.. Document filed by Texaco Inc. Inc..(Cuonzo, Angelo)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristin Carter Rowe on behalf of Yorktown Jaz LLC. (Rowe, Kristin)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dean Stuart Sommer on behalf of Yorktown Jaz LLC. (Sommer, Dean)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 68021/2018. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15995487).Document filed by Texaco Downstream, Texaco Inc. Inc., Chevron Environmental Management Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, Complaint and Exhibits to Complaint, #2 Exhibits to Complaint, #3 Exhibits to Complaint, #4 Exhibits to Complaint, #5 Exhibits to Complaint, #6 Exhibits to Complaint, #7 Exhibits to Complaint, #8 Exhibits to Complaint, #9 Exhibits to Complaint, #10 Exhibits to Complaint, #11 Exhibits to Complaint, #12 Exhibits to Complaint, #13 Proof of Service)(Cuonzo, Angelo)
December 3, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
December 3, 2018 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
December 3, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
December 3, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Angelo A. Cuonzo. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Texaco Downstream Properties Inc., TEXACO, INC.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps. (dnh)
December 3, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Angelo A. Cuonzo. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1446pd; Jury Demand code p (Plaintiff); Dollar Demand 1,200,000,000; Arbitration code v (Voluntary); County code Westchester. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1446nr; the Jury Demand code has been modified to d (Defendant); the Dollar Demand has been modified to 1,200.000; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (dnh)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cuonzo, Angelo)
December 3, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Angelo A. Cuonzo to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Due to party modification the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 68021/2018. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15986772).Document filed by Texaco Downstream Properties Inc., TEXACO, INC.;, Chevron Environmental Management Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint with Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint, #7 Errata Exhibits to Complaint, #8 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint, #9 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint, #10 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint, #11 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint, #12 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Proof of Service)(Cuonzo, Angelo) Modified on 12/3/2018 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yorktown Jaz LLC v. Texaco Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texaco Downstream Properties Inc.
Represented By: Angelo A. Cuonzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Environmental Management Company
Represented By: Angelo A. Cuonzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEXACO REFINING & MARKETING INC.;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEXACO, INC.;
Represented By: Angelo A. Cuonzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texaco Inc. Inc.
Represented By: Angelo A. Cuonzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texaco Refining and Marketing Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texaco Downstream
Represented By: Angelo A. Cuonzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yorktown Jaz LLC
Represented By: Kristin Carter Rowe
Represented By: Dean Stuart Sommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?