Avail 1 LLC v. Adovasio
Plaintiff: Avail 1 LLC
Defendant: Andrea C. Adovasio
Case Number: 7:2018cv11209
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Andrea C. Adovasio served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. Document filed by Avail 1 LLC. (Weinreb, Alan)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrea C. Adovasio. (dnh)
December 4, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
December 4, 2018 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
December 4, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
December 4, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Alan H. Weinreb. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1345fc. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332. (dnh)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 OATH Certificate of Merit Affirmation Pursuant to CPLR 3012-b. Document filed by Avail 1 LLC.(Weinreb, Alan)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Avail 1 LLC.(Weinreb, Alan)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrea C. Adovasio, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Avail 1 LLC. (Weinreb, Alan)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Weinreb, Alan)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrea C. Adovasio. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15992213)Document filed by Avail 1 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Exhibit F, #2 N.Y. RPAPL 1320 Notice)(Weinreb, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avail 1 LLC v. Adovasio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea C. Adovasio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avail 1 LLC
Represented By: Alan H. Weinreb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?