Days v. Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Selwyn Days
Defendant: County of Westchester, Eastchester Police Department, George Barletta, Mario Astarita, Christopher Calabrese, Matthew Kiernan, Westchester County Police Department and Town of Eastchester
Case Number: 7:2018cv11538
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #26 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 25 Letter by Defendants Requesting Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Rob Rickner, Esq. dated 2/7/2019. Document filed by Selwyn Days. The application is granted. Clerk of the Court requested to terminate the motion (doc. 26). (Responses due by 2/12/2019). (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 2/8/2019) (rjm)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #25 LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Fay Angela Jones dated February 5 2019 re: Requesting Conference. Document filed by Christopher Calabrese, Westchester County Police Department, County of Westchester. ENDORSEMENT: Pre-Motion also scheduled for Feb. 28, 2019 at 11:00 am. So ordered. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 2/28/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Nelson Stephen Roman.) (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 2/8/2019) (rjm)
February 8, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/28/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 218, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. (rj)
February 7, 2019 Filing 26 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #25 Letter by Defendants Requesting Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Rob Rickner, Esq. dated 2/7/2019. Document filed by Selwyn Days.(Rickner, Robert)
February 5, 2019 Filing 25 LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Fay Angela Jones dated February 5 2019 re: Requesting Conference. Document filed by Christopher Calabrese, Westchester County Police Department, County of Westchester.(Jones, Fay)
February 5, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Fay Angela Jones on behalf of Christopher Calabrese, Westchester County Police Department, County of Westchester. (Jones, Fay)
February 4, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Mario Astarita, George Barletta, Town of Eastchester, Matthew Kiernan, Eastchester Police Department.(Crispi, Ronald)
February 4, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ronald George Crispi on behalf of Mario Astarita, George Barletta, Town of Eastchester, Matthew Kiernan, Eastchester Police Department. (Crispi, Ronald)
February 1, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Francis Cerussi on behalf of Mario Astarita, George Barletta, Town of Eastchester, Matthew Kiernan, Eastchester Police Department. (Cerussi, Thomas)
January 21, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Mario Astarita served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. Service was accepted by Linda Laird. Document filed by Selwyn Days. (Rickner, Robert)
January 21, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Westchester County Police Department served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. Service was accepted by Sgt Jose Calero. Document filed by Selwyn Days. (Rickner, Robert)
January 21, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. County of Westchester served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. Service was accepted by Donna Dixon. Document filed by Selwyn Days. (Rickner, Robert)
January 21, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Matthew Kiernan served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. Service was accepted by Linda Laird. Document filed by Selwyn Days. (Rickner, Robert)
January 21, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Town of Eastchester served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. Service was accepted by Linda Laird. Document filed by Selwyn Days. (Rickner, Robert)
January 21, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Christopher Calabrese served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. Service was accepted by Sgt Jose Calero. Document filed by Selwyn Days. (Rickner, Robert)
January 21, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. George Barletta served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. Service was accepted by Linda Laird. Document filed by Selwyn Days. (Rickner, Robert)
January 8, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Christopher Calabrese, Westchester County Police Department. (sj)
January 8, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mario Astarita, George Barletta, Matthew Kiernan, Eastchester Police Department. (sj)
January 8, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Town of Eastchester. (sj)
January 8, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to County of Westchester. (sj)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE WESTCHESTER COUNTY POLICE DEPARTMENT, CHRISTOPHER CALABRESE, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Selwyn Days. (Rickner, Robert)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE EASTCHESTER POLICE DEPARTMENT, MARIO ASTARITA, GEORGE BARLETTA, MATTHEW KIERNAN, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Selwyn Days. (Rickner, Robert)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Howard Rickner on behalf of Selwyn Days. (Rickner, Robert)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE TOWN OF EASTCHESTER, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Selwyn Days. (Rickner, Robert)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE COUNTY OF WESTCHESTER, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Selwyn Days. (Rickner, Robert)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE WESTCHESTER COUNTY POLICE DEPARTMENT, CHRISTOPHER CALABRESE, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christopher Calabrese, Westchester County Police Department. (Rickner, Robert) Modified on 1/7/2019 (sj).
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE EASTCHESTER POLICE DEPARTMENT, MARIO ASTARITA, GEORGE BARLETTA, MATTHEW KIERNAN, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mario Astarita, George Barletta, Matthew Kiernan, Eastchester Police Department. (Rickner, Robert) Modified on 1/7/2019 (sj).
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Garber, Glenn)
December 12, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 12, 2018 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
December 12, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
December 12, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Glenn Andrew Garber. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mario Astarita, George Barletta, Christopher Calabrese, Town of Eastchester, Matthew Kiernan, Westchester County Police Department, Eastchester Police Department, County of Westchester. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16033831)Document filed by Selwyn Days.(Garber, Glenn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Days v. Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Westchester
Represented By: Fay Angela Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastchester Police Department
Represented By: Ronald George Crispi
Represented By: Thomas Francis Cerussi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Barletta
Represented By: Ronald George Crispi
Represented By: Thomas Francis Cerussi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Astarita
Represented By: Ronald George Crispi
Represented By: Thomas Francis Cerussi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Calabrese
Represented By: Fay Angela Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Kiernan
Represented By: Ronald George Crispi
Represented By: Thomas Francis Cerussi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchester County Police Department
Represented By: Fay Angela Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Eastchester
Represented By: Ronald George Crispi
Represented By: Thomas Francis Cerussi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selwyn Days
Represented By: Glenn Andrew Garber
Represented By: Robert Howard Rickner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?