Babcock v. Montefiore Nyack Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Ryerson Babcock
Defendant: Montefiore Nyack Hospital d/b/a The Nyack Hospital, Mary Shinick, Manny Umpiere, Jose Rodrigues and Montefiore Nyack Hospital
Case Number: 7:2018cv11565
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the attorneys for Plaintiff and Defendants Montefiore Nyack Hospital, Jose Rodrigues, Mary Shinick, and Manny Umpiere, that Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint shall be extended to February 18, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Montefiore Nyack Hospital answer due 2/18/2019; Jose Rodrigues answer due 2/18/2019; Mary Shinick answer due 2/18/2019; Manny Umpiere answer due 2/18/2019.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 1/17/2019) (jca)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Montefiore Nyack Hospital, Jose Rodrigues, Mary Shinick, Manny Umpiere. (Cesaratto, Brian)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erica Sanders on behalf of Ryerson Babcock. (Sanders, Erica)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Montefiore Nyack Hospital served on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Legal Clerk. Document filed by Ryerson Babcock. (Phillips, William)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Montefiore Nyack Hospital served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019; Jose Rodrigues served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019; Mary Shinick served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019; Manny Umpiere served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. Service was accepted by Angelica Gomulka,Legal Clerk/Co-Worker. Document filed by Ryerson Babcock. (Phillips, William)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Montefiore Nyack Hospital, Jose Rodrigues, Mary Shinick, Manny Umpiere. (jgo)
December 12, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 12, 2018 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
December 12, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
December 12, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Parisis G. Filippatos. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ryerson Babcock; Montefiore Nyack Hospital. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; alias was entered incorrectly. (jgo)
December 12, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Parisis G. Filippatos. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Orange;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (jgo)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Montefiore Nyack Hospital d/b/a The Nyack Hospital, Jose Rodrigues, Mary Shinick, and Manny Umpiere, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ryerson Babcock. (Filippatos, Parisis)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Filippatos, Parisis)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Montefiore Nyack Hospital d/b/a The Nyack Hospital, Jose Rodrigues, Mary Shinick, Manny Umpiere. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16036015)Document filed by Ryerson Babcock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Notice of Right to Sue)(Filippatos, Parisis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Babcock v. Montefiore Nyack Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montefiore Nyack Hospital d/b/a The Nyack Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Shinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manny Umpiere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Rodrigues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montefiore Nyack Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryerson Babcock
Represented By: Parisis G. Filippatos
Represented By: Erica Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?