Avail Holding LLC v. Mentzines et al
Plaintiff: Avail Holding LLC
Defendant: Suzana Vuletich and Stephen Socrates Mentzines
Case Number: 7:2018cv11908
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332fc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Suzana Vuletich. (dnh)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Stephen Socrates Mentzines. (dnh)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Suzana Vuletich, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Avail Holding LLC. (Weinreb, Alan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Stephen Socrates Mentzines, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Avail Holding LLC. (Weinreb, Alan)
December 19, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Alan H. Weinreb to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): each summons request must be filed seperately; multiple summons requests can not be filed in one PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
December 19, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
December 19, 2018 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
December 19, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 OATH Certificate of Merit Affirmation pursuant to CPLR 3012-b. Document filed by Avail Holding LLC.(Weinreb, Alan)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Avail Holding LLC.(Weinreb, Alan)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Stephen Socrates Mentzines and Suzana Vuletich, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Avail Holding LLC. (Weinreb, Alan) Modified on 12/19/2018 (pne).
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Weinreb, Alan)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stephen Socrates Mentzines, Suzana Vuletich. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16073924)Document filed by Avail Holding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through Exhibit E, #2 N.Y. RPAPL 1320 Notice)(Weinreb, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avail Holding LLC v. Mentzines et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzana Vuletich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Socrates Mentzines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avail Holding LLC
Represented By: Alan H. Weinreb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?