Keebaugh v. International Business Machines Corp.

Plaintiff: Ms. Terry Keebaugh
Defendant: International Business Machines Corp. and International Business Machines Corporation
Case Number: 7:2018cv12126
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331ed
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (http://nysd.uscourts.gov/mediation). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 2/22/2019. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (mf)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Alison B. Marshall to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
February 11, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Alison B. Marshall to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16327639. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
February 11, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Alison B. Marshall to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16327639. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Marshall Affidavit, #2 Exhibit DC Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Supreme Court of Michigan Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit A. Marshall Proposed Order)(Marshall, Alison)
February 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties herein shall attend a conference for the purpose of case management and scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.16 on March 7, 2019 at 2:45 p.m. in Courtroom 621, Charles L. Brieant United States Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, New York. Initial Conference set for 3/7/2019 at 02:45 PM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel. (mml)
February 8, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by International Business Machines Corporation.(Lampe, Matthew)
January 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristina Ann Yost on behalf of International Business Machines Corporation. (Yost, Kristina)
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erika D Cagney on behalf of International Business Machines Corporation. (Cagney, Erika)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: International Business Machines Corporation may have until 2/8/19 to respond to the Complaint. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by International Business Machines Corporation.(Lampe, Matthew)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Matthew W. Lampe dated 1/16/2019. Document filed by International Business Machines Corporation.(Lampe, Matthew)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. International Business Machines Corporation served on 1/4/2019, answer due 1/25/2019. Service was accepted by Carmen Alvarez, Executive Assistant. Document filed by Terry Keebaugh. (Vladeck, Anne)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Allison Lindsey Van Kampen on behalf of Terry Keebaugh. (Van Kampen, Allison)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to International Business Machines Corporation. (dnh)
December 26, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
December 26, 2018 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
December 26, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
December 26, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Anne C. Vladeck. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (dnh)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to International Business Machines Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Terry Keebaugh. (Vladeck, Anne)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Vladeck, Anne)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against International Business Machines Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16099608)Document filed by Terry Keebaugh.(Vladeck, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keebaugh v. International Business Machines Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Business Machines Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Willis Lampe
Represented By: Alison B. Marshall
Represented By: Kristina Ann Yost
Represented By: Erika D Cagney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Terry Keebaugh
Represented By: Anne C. Vladeck
Represented By: Allison Lindsey Van Kampen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?