Freedom Mortgage Corp. v. Demarco-Hudson
Plaintiff: Freedom Mortgage Corp.
Defendant: Mary Demarco-Hudson
Case Number: 7:2019cv00517
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332fc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Mary Demarco-Hudson. (km)
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corp.. (Vargas, Stephen) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Mary Demarco-Hudson in Support. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Vargas, Stephen)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Service was accepted by Mary Demarco-Hudson, Borrower. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corp.. (Vargas, Stephen)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Mary Demarco-Hudson served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/13/2019. Service was accepted by Mary Demarco-Hudson, Borrower. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corp.. (Vargas, Stephen)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mary Demarco-Hudson. (sj)
January 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
January 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
January 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corp..(Vargas, Stephen)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Vargas, Stephen)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mary Demarco-Hudson, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corp.. (Vargas, Stephen)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mary Demarco-Hudson. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16208061)Document filed by Freedom Mortgage Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Merit Pursuant to CPLR 3012-B)(Vargas, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freedom Mortgage Corp. v. Demarco-Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freedom Mortgage Corp.
Represented By: Stephen John Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Demarco-Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?