Moon v. Moon et al
Plaintiff: Hyung Jin Moon
Defendant: Holy Spirit Association for the Unification of World Christianity, Michael Balcomb, Hyo Yul Kim, Hak Ja Han Moon, Ki Hoon Kim, Alexa Ward, Farley Jones, Family Federation, Chang Shik Yang, Douglas Joo, Michael W. Jenkins, Douglas D.M. Joo and Family Federation for World Peace and Unification International
Case Number: 7:2019cv01705
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 39 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Laura G. Ferguson dated April 18, 2019 re: #36 LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Philip Y. Kouyoumdjian dated April 17, 2019., #33 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss , Requesting Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Laura G. Feruson dated 04/15/2019. . Document filed by Family Federation for World Peace and Unification International, Holy Spirit Association for the Unification of World Christianity, Ki Hoon Kim, Hak Ja Han Moon. (Ferguson, Laura)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #37 Motion for Jonathan G. Polak to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 4/18/2019) (rro)
April 18, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #37 MOTION for Jonathan Garland Polak to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16715895. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
April 17, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Jonathan Garland Polak to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16715895. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Hyung Jin Moon. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit ISO Motion for PHV, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Polak, Jonathan)
April 17, 2019 Filing 36 LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Philip Y. Kouyoumdjian dated April 17, 2019. Document filed by Hyung Jin Moon.(Kouyoumdjian, Philip)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #34 Motion for Michael J. Satin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 4/17/2019) (ama)
April 17, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #34 MOTION for Michael J. Satin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16709701. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
April 16, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Michael J. Satin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16709701. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Family Federation for World Peace and Unification International, Holy Spirit Association for the Unification of World Christianity, Ki Hoon Kim, Hak Ja Han Moon. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Satin, Michael)
April 15, 2019 Filing 33 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss , Requesting Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Laura G. Feruson dated 04/15/2019. Document filed by Family Federation for World Peace and Unification International, Holy Spirit Association for the Unification of World Christianity, Ki Hoon Kim, Hak Ja Han Moon.(Ferguson, Laura)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #28 Motion for Alan I. Horowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 4/15/2019) (jwh)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #27 Motion for Brian A. Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 4/15/2019) (jwh)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #26 Motion for James A. Bensfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 4/15/2019) (jwh)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #25 Motion for Laura G. Ferguson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 4/15/2019) (jwh)
April 12, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #28 MOTION for Alan I. Horowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected to be one docket entry. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
April 12, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Alan I. Horowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected to be one docket entry. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Family Federation for World Peace and Unification International, Holy Spirit Association for the Unification of World Christianity, Ki Hoon Kim, Hak Ja Han Moon. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Horowitz, Alan)
April 12, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #26 MOTION for James A. Bensfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected to be one docket entry. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #27 MOTION for Brian A. Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected to be one docket entry. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #25 MOTION for Laura G. Ferguson to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected to be one docket entry. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
April 12, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Brian A. Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected to be one docket entry. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Family Federation for World Peace and Unification International, Holy Spirit Association for the Unification of World Christianity, Ki Hoon Kim, Hak Ja Han Moon. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Brian)
April 12, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for James A. Bensfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected to be one docket entry. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Family Federation for World Peace and Unification International, Holy Spirit Association for the Unification of World Christianity, Ki Hoon Kim, Hak Ja Han Moon. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Bensfield, James)
April 12, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Laura G. Ferguson to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected to be one docket entry. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Family Federation for World Peace and Unification International, Holy Spirit Association for the Unification of World Christianity, Ki Hoon Kim, Hak Ja Han Moon. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferguson, Laura)
April 12, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #23 MOTION for Alan I. Horowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16675802. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #19 MOTION for James A. Bensfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16675369. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #17 MOTION for Laura G. Ferguson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16675296. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #21 MOTION for Brian A. Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16675607. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the affidavit must be attached as an exhibit to the motion. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (ma)
April 11, 2019 Filing 24 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIDAVIT of Alan I. Horowitz in Support re: #23 MOTION for Alan I. Horowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16675802. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Document filed by Family Federation for World Peace and Unification International, Holy Spirit Association for the Unification of World Christianity, Ki Hoon Kim, Hak Ja Han Moon. (Horowitz, Alan) Modified on 4/12/2019 (ma).
April 11, 2019 Filing 23 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Alan I. Horowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16675802. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Family Federation for World Peace and Unification International, Holy Spirit Association for the Unification of World Christianity, Ki Hoon Kim, Hak Ja Han Moon. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Horowitz, Alan) Modified on 4/12/2019 (ma).
April 11, 2019 Filing 22 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIDAVIT of Brian A. Hill in Support re: #21 MOTION for Brian A. Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16675607. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Document filed by Family Federation for World Peace and Unification International, Holy Spirit Association for the Unification of World Christianity, Ki Hoon Kim, Hak Ja Han Moon. (Hill, Brian) Modified on 4/12/2019 (ma).
April 11, 2019 Filing 21 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Brian A. Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16675607. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Family Federation for World Peace and Unification International, Holy Spirit Association for the Unification of World Christianity, Ki Hoon Kim, Hak Ja Han Moon. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Brian) Modified on 4/12/2019 (ma).
April 11, 2019 Filing 20 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIDAVIT of James A. Bensfield in Support re: #19 MOTION for James A. Bensfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16675369. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Document filed by Family Federation for World Peace and Unification International, Holy Spirit Association for the Unification of World Christianity, Ki Hoon Kim, Hak Ja Han Moon. (Bensfield, James) Modified on 4/12/2019 (ma).
April 11, 2019 Filing 19 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for James A. Bensfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16675369. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Family Federation for World Peace and Unification International, Holy Spirit Association for the Unification of World Christianity, Ki Hoon Kim, Hak Ja Han Moon. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bensfield, James) Modified on 4/12/2019 (ma).
April 11, 2019 Filing 18 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIDAVIT of Laura G. Ferguson in Support re: #17 MOTION for Laura G. Ferguson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16675296. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Document filed by Family Federation for World Peace and Unification International, Holy Spirit Association for the Unification of World Christianity, Ki Hoon Kim, Hak Ja Han Moon. (Ferguson, Laura) Modified on 4/12/2019 (ma).
April 11, 2019 Filing 17 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Laura G. Ferguson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16675296. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Family Federation for World Peace and Unification International, Holy Spirit Association for the Unification of World Christianity, Ki Hoon Kim, Hak Ja Han Moon. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferguson, Laura) Modified on 4/12/2019 (ma).
March 25, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ki Hoon Kim. (dnh)
March 25, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ki Hoon Kim, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Hyung Jin Moon. (Polak, Jonathan)
March 22, 2019 Filing 14 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kouyoumdjian, Philip)
March 22, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hak Ja Han Moon. (pne)
March 22, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hak Ja Han Moon, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Hyung Jin Moon. (Kouyoumdjian, Philip)
March 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Philip Yvan Kouyoumdjian to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Defendant Party Name Error. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Family Federation for World Peace and Unification International. (vf)
March 18, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Farley Jones. (vf)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Holy Spirit Association for the Unification of World Christianity. (vf)
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Family Federation for World Peace and Unification International, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Hyung Jin Moon. (Kouyoumdjian, Philip)
March 15, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Farley Jones, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Hyung Jin Moon. (Kouyoumdjian, Philip)
March 15, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT- SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Jenkins, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Hyung Jin Moon. (Kouyoumdjian, Philip) Modified on 3/18/2019 (vf).
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Holy Spirit Association for the Unification of World Christianity, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Hyung Jin Moon. (Kouyoumdjian, Philip)
March 14, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Philip Yvan Kouyoumdjian to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Defendant Name Error; the defendant name listed in the 'To:' section of the PDF must exactly match the party of record. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
March 13, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hak Ja Han Moon, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Hyung Jin Moon. (Kouyoumdjian, Philip) Modified on 3/14/2019 (dnh).
February 25, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
February 25, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
February 25, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
February 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Philip Yvan Kouyoumdjian to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; Origin, Basis of Jurisdiction and Courthouse assignment not chosen. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (sj)
February 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Philip Yvan Kouyoumdjian. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Westchester; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
February 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Philip Yvan Kouyoumdjian to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF (John Does 1-6 must be added); the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected due to party modification to correspond with pleading. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
February 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Philip Yvan Kouyoumdjian. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Hyung Jin Moon; Family Federation for World Peace and Unification International; Hyo Yul Kim; Douglas D.M. Joo. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted. (sj)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Philip Yvan Kouyoumdjian on behalf of Hyung Jin Moon. New Address: Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP, 111 East Wacker Drive, Suite 2800, Chicago, IL, USA 60601, 312.527.4000. (Kouyoumdjian, Philip)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET - PDF ERROR CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kouyoumdjian, Philip) Modified on 2/25/2019 (sj).
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against Michael Balcomb, Family Federation, Holy Spirit Association for the Unification of World Christianity, Michael W. Jenkins, Farley Jones, Douglas Joo, Hyo Yul Kim, Ki Hoon Kim, Hak Ja Han Moon, Alexa Ward, Chang Shik Yang. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16393895)Document filed by Hyung Jin Moon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Kouyoumdjian, Philip) Modified on 2/25/2019 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moon v. Moon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holy Spirit Association for the Unification of World Christianity
Represented By: Alan I. Horowitz
Represented By: James A. Bensfield
Represented By: Michael J. Satin
Represented By: Laura G. Ferguson
Represented By: Brian A. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Balcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyo Yul Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hak Ja Han Moon
Represented By: Alan I. Horowitz
Represented By: James A. Bensfield
Represented By: Michael J. Satin
Represented By: Laura G. Ferguson
Represented By: Brian A. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ki Hoon Kim
Represented By: Alan I. Horowitz
Represented By: James A. Bensfield
Represented By: Michael J. Satin
Represented By: Laura G. Ferguson
Represented By: Brian A. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexa Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farley Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Federation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chang Shik Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Joo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael W. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas D.M. Joo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Federation for World Peace and Unification International
Represented By: Alan I. Horowitz
Represented By: James A. Bensfield
Represented By: Michael J. Satin
Represented By: Laura G. Ferguson
Represented By: Brian A. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hyung Jin Moon
Represented By: Philip Yvan Kouyoumdjian
Represented By: Jonathan Garland Polak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?