Benedict Sr. v. Minerals Resort & Spa, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Benedict Sr.
Defendant: Minerals Resort & Spa, Inc., Crystal Springs Acquisition LLC d/b/a Crystal Springs Services Inc., Crystal Springs Resorts, Stone Hill Recreation Corporation, Minerals Resort & Spa Management Inc. d/b/a Mineral Resorts and Spa, Grand Cascades Lodge at Crystal Springs LLC, Crystal Springs Golf Course, Crystal Springs Pool & Spa, Inc., Crystal Springs Acquisition LLC, Minerals Resort & Spa Management Inc. and Crystal Springs Golf Course, LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv01734
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332pi
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Debi Kabatra. Document filed by Dennis Benedict Sr.. (DiPrisco, Dominic)
April 2, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Minerals Resort & Spa, Inc. served on 3/1/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. Service was accepted by Debi Kabatra. Document filed by Dennis Benedict Sr.. (DiPrisco, Dominic)
April 2, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Crystal Springs Acquisition LLC served on 3/1/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. Service was accepted by Debi Kabatra. Document filed by Dennis Benedict Sr.. (DiPrisco, Dominic)
April 2, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Dennis Benedict Sr. served on 3/1/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. Service was accepted by Debi Kabatra. Document filed by Dennis Benedict Sr.. (DiPrisco, Dominic)
April 2, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Debi Kabatra. Document filed by Dennis Benedict Sr.. (DiPrisco, Dominic)
April 2, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Grand Cascades Lodge at Crystal Springs LLC served on 3/1/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. Service was accepted by Debi Kabatra. Document filed by Dennis Benedict Sr.. (DiPrisco, Dominic)
April 2, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Debi Kabatra. Document filed by Dennis Benedict Sr.. (DiPrisco, Dominic)
April 2, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Minerals Resort & Spa Management Inc. served on 3/1/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. Service was accepted by Debi Kabatra. Document filed by Dennis Benedict Sr.. (DiPrisco, Dominic)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Crystal Springs Golf Course, LLC served on 3/14/2019, answer due 4/4/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky. Document filed by Dennis Benedict Sr.. (DiPrisco, Dominic)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Crystal Springs Golf Course, LLC on March 5, 2019. Service was accepted by Lisa Knight. Document filed by Dennis Benedict Sr.. (DiPrisco, Dominic)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Crystal Springs Acquisition LLC, Crystal Springs Golf Course, LLC, Crystal Springs Pool & Spa, Inc., Grand Cascades Lodge at Crystal Springs LLC, Minerals Resort & Spa Management Inc., Minerals Resort & Spa, Inc., Stone Hill Recreation Corporation. (dnh)
March 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Dominic DiPrisco. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Crystal Springs Golf Course. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (dnh)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Minerals Resort & Spa, Inc, minerals resort & spa management inc d/b/a mineral resorts and spa, crystal springs pool & spa, inc. d/b/a crystal springs resorts, Grand cascades lodge at crystal springs, crystal springs golf course, llc, crystal springs acquisition llc d/b/a crystal springs services, inc., Stone hill recreation corporation, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Dennis Benedict Sr.. (DiPrisco, Dominic) Modified on 3/1/2019 (dnh). Modified on 3/4/2019 (dnh).
February 27, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Dominic DiPrisco to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Docket entry must reflect all parties as to whom the summons is being requested. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (DiPrisco, Dominic)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Minerals Resort & Spa, Inc, et al., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Dennis Benedict Sr.. (DiPrisco, Dominic) Modified on 2/27/2019 (dnh).
February 26, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 26, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
February 26, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
February 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Dominic DiPrisco to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
February 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Dominic DiPrisco. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1,000,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $1,000,000;. (pc)
February 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Dominic DiPrisco to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet; Multiple citizenship of principal parties for the defendant were selected. Choose one. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (pc)
February 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Dominic DiPrisco. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Minerals Resort & Spa Management Inc. d/b/a Mineral Resorts and Spa, Crystal Springs Resorts, Crystal Springs Acquisition LLC d/b/a Crystal Springs Services Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Crystal Springs Acquisition LLC d/b/a Crystal Springs Services Inc., Crystal Springs Golf Course, Crystal Springs Resorts, Grand Cascades Lodge at Crystal Springs LLC, Minerals Resort & Spa Management Inc. d/b/a Mineral Resorts and Spa, Minerals Resort & Spa, Inc., Stone Hill Recreation Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16399540)Document filed by Dennis Benedict Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(DiPrisco, Dominic)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benedict Sr. v. Minerals Resort & Spa, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minerals Resort & Spa, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Springs Acquisition LLC d/b/a Crystal Springs Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Springs Resorts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stone Hill Recreation Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minerals Resort & Spa Management Inc. d/b/a Mineral Resorts and Spa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Cascades Lodge at Crystal Springs LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Springs Golf Course
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Springs Pool & Spa, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Springs Acquisition LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minerals Resort & Spa Management Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Springs Golf Course, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Benedict Sr.
Represented By: Dominic DiPrisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?