Lenorowitz v. Mosquito Squad Franchising, LLC et al

Plaintiff: SAMUEL LENOROWITZ
Defendant: Mosquito Squad Franchising, LLC, John Does 1-25 and Mosquito Squad of Fairfield and Westchester County
Case Number: 7:2019cv04460
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Mosquito Squad Franchising, LLC.(Mason, Christopher)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Christopher J. Sovak dated June 20, 2019 re: letter requesting extension for MSFWC to respond to Complaint. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted., Mosquito Squad of Fairfield and Westchester County answer due 7/26/2019. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 7/2/2019) (ks)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Mosquito Squad of Fairfield and Westchester County served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. Service was accepted by Andrea Denner, Office Manager. Document filed by Samuel Lenorowitz. (Marcus, Ari)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher John Sovak on behalf of Mosquito Squad of Fairfield and Westchester County. (Sovak, Christopher)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Christopher M. Mason dated 6/18/2019 re: Request an extension of time to July 19, 2019 to answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to the Class Action Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial in this action. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted., Mosquito Squad Franchising, LLC answer due 7/19/2019. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 6/18/2019) (rj) Modified on 6/24/2019 (rj).
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher May Mason on behalf of Mosquito Squad Franchising, LLC. (Mason, Christopher)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Mosquito Squad Franchising, LLC served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. Service was accepted by Teresa Brown, RA. Document filed by Samuel Lenorowitz. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mosquito Squad Franchising, LLC, Mosquito Squad of Fairfield and Westchester County. (dnh)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mosquito Squad Franchising, LLC and Mosquito Squad of Fairfield and Westchester County, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Samuel Lenorowitz. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
May 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Yitzchak Zelman to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Every party must be listed on the summons form;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
May 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
May 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
May 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Yitzchak Zelman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: SAMUEL LENOROWITZ. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mosquito Squad Franchising, LLC and Mosquito Squad of Fairfield and Westchester County, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by SAMUEL LENOROWITZ. (Zelman, Yitzchak) Modified on 5/17/2019 (pc).
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Does 1-25, Mosquito Squad Franchising, LLC, Mosquito Squad of Fairfield and Westchester County. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16895770)Document filed by SAMUEL LENOROWITZ.(Zelman, Yitzchak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lenorowitz v. Mosquito Squad Franchising, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mosquito Squad Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Christopher May Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mosquito Squad of Fairfield and Westchester County
Represented By: Christopher John Sovak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMUEL LENOROWITZ
Represented By: Yitzchak Zelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?