Barnes v. Yendyk et al
Plaintiff: Keith A. Barnes
Defendant: TARAS YENDYK and BEST WAY LOGISTICS 1 INC.
Case Number: 7:2019cv04473
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332md
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. This case is to be tried to a jury. Amended pleadings may not be filed and additional parties may not be joined except with leave of the Court. Motions due by 8/11/2019. Fact Discovery due by 1/11/2020. Non-Expert Deposition due by 1/11/2020. Expert Discovery due by 7/11/2020. Expert Deposition due by 7/11/2020. Discovery due by 7/11/2020. The parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of the trial is 5 days. Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 7/11/2019) (jwh)
July 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/11/2019. Case management plan signed. Next conference is scheduled 1-23-20 at 10 am (dh)
July 10, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shawn Michael Cestaro on behalf of Best Way Logistics 1 Inc., Taras Yendyk. (Cestaro, Shawn)
June 21, 2019 Filing 19 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Best Way Logistics 1 Inc., Taras Yendyk. (Schwartz, Bryan)
June 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED ORDER. Notice to attorney Bryan Schwartz to RE-FILE Document No. #18 Proposed Order. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the proposed order; Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Scheduling Order found under the event list Proposed Orders. - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed (scanned signature image) and dated PDF. (dt)
June 21, 2019 Filing 18 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Best Way Logistics 1 Inc., Taras Yendyk. (Schwartz, Bryan) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 6/21/2019 (dt).
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #16 Rule 26 Disclosure filed by Keith A. Barnes. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall not file discovery documents unless in connection with a motion to compel discovery. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(d)(1); S.D.N.Y. Local Civ. R. 5.1. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 6/7/2019) (anc)
June 6, 2019 Filing 16 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Keith A. Barnes.(Menna, Robert)
June 6, 2019 Filing 15 FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES to TARAS YENDYK and BESTWAY LOGISTICS 1 INC..Document filed by Keith A. Barnes.(Menna, Robert)
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Keith A. Barnes.(Menna, Robert)
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Best Way Logistics 1 Inc., Taras Yendyk. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service for Rule 7.1 Statement)(Schwartz, Bryan)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 620, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. (As further set forth in this Notice.) (cf)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Best Way Logistics 1 Inc., Taras Yendyk.(Schwartz, Bryan)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bryan T. Schwartz on behalf of Best Way Logistics 1 Inc., Taras Yendyk. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service for Notice of Appearance)(Schwartz, Bryan)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Best Way Logistics 1 Inc., Taras Yendyk. (dnh)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TARAS YENDYK and BEST WAY LOGISTICS 1 INC., re: #7 Complaint. Document filed by Keith A. Barnes. (Menna, Robert)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Best Way Logistics 1 Inc., Taras Yendyk. Document filed by Keith A. Barnes.(Menna, Robert)
May 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Robert John Menna to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Summonses may only be linked to one pleading. Re-file the Summons request after correcting the pleading deficiency. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
May 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert John Menna to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Complaint, #4 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties whom the pleading is against were not selected; hold the 'Ctrl' button and select all of the parties as to whom the pleading is being filed against individually. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TARAS YENDYK and BEST WAY LOGISTICS 1 INC., re: #3 Complaint, #4 Complaint. Document filed by Keith A. Barnes. (Menna, Robert) Modified on 5/21/2019 (dnh).
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Menna, Robert)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against Taras Yendyk. Document filed by Keith A. Barnes.(Menna, Robert) Modified on 5/21/2019 (dnh).
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against Best Way Logistics 1 Inc.. Document filed by Keith A. Barnes.(Menna, Robert) Modified on 5/21/2019 (dnh).
May 20, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 20, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
May 20, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
May 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Robert John Menna to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Multiple citizenship of principal parties for the defendant were selected. Choose one. (pc)
May 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert John Menna. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
May 20, 2019 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #2 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-16896608, paid on 5/16/2019. (pc)
May 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert John Menna to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
May 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert John Menna. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: TARAS YENDYK, BEST WAY LOGISTICS 1 INC.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Document filed by Keith A. Barnes.(Menna, Robert) Modified on 5/20/2019 (pc).
May 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Robert John Menna to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 5/22/2019. (pc)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Menna, Robert) Modified on 5/20/2019 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. Yendyk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith A. Barnes
Represented By: Robert John Menna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARAS YENDYK
Represented By: Bryan T. Schwartz
Represented By: Shawn Michael Cestaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEST WAY LOGISTICS 1 INC.
Represented By: Bryan T. Schwartz
Represented By: Shawn Michael Cestaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?