Jersey Point Management, Inc. v. Fidelity And Deposit Company of Maryland
Plaintiff: Jersey Point Management, Inc.
Defendant: Fidelity And Deposit Company of Maryland
Case Number: 7:2019cv04510
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1352
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties herein shall attend a conference for the purpose of case management and scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 on July 25, 2019 at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom 621, Charles L. Brieant United States Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, New York. Initial Conference set for 7/25/2019 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel. (mml)
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Fidelity And Deposit Company of Maryland.(Bondy, Jonathan)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Financial Services Corp.(Swiss Corp.), Other Affiliate Zurich American Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Zurich Insurance Co., Other Affiliate Zurich Holding Company of America Inc. for Fidelity And Deposit Company of Maryland. Document filed by Fidelity And Deposit Company of Maryland.(Bondy, Jonathan)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION & ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the undersigned that the time within which defendant Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland may answer, appear or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action is extended through and including June 28, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 6/12/2019) (mml)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Fidelity And Deposit Company of Maryland answer due 6/28/2019. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Daniel W. White, Esq. dated June 12, 2019. Document filed by Fidelity And Deposit Company of Maryland.(White, Daniel)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Fidelity And Deposit Company of Maryland. (Bondy, Jonathan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Ward White on behalf of Fidelity And Deposit Company of Maryland. (White, Daniel)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan S Bondy on behalf of Fidelity And Deposit Company of Maryland. (Bondy, Jonathan)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Fidelity And Deposit Company of Maryland served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. Service was accepted by Danielle Marcotte, Claims Specialist. Document filed by Jersey Point Management, Inc.. (Wise, David)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fidelity And Deposit Company of Maryland. (sj)
May 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
May 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
May 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
May 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David Russell Wise. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 18:1352; County code Orange; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 40:3133; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
May 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Russell Wise. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jersey Point Management, Inc.; Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (sj)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jersey Point Management, Inc.. (Wise, David)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wise, David)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Jersey Point Management, Inc..(Wise, David)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fidelity And Deposit Company of Maryland. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16901223)Document filed by Jersey Point Management, Inc..(Wise, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jersey Point Management, Inc. v. Fidelity And Deposit Company of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jersey Point Management, Inc.
Represented By: David Russell Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity And Deposit Company of Maryland
Represented By: Jonathan S Bondy
Represented By: Daniel Ward White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?