Greifman v. Grossman & Karaszewski, PLLC
Plaintiff: Sarah Greifman
Defendant: Grossman & Karaszewski, PLLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv04625
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion for Conference:" The parties may appear by phone for the initial conference, provided that they submit a proposed case management plan/scheduling order in advance. They should contact my courtroom deputy, Walter Clark (914-390-4077 or walter_clark@nysd.uscourts.gov) to make arrangements to phone in. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
July 18, 2019 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION for Conference Request to Appear Telephonically addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Stephanie Strickler dated 7-18-2019. Document filed by Grossman & Karaszewski, PLLC. Return Date set for 7/23/2019 at 10:15 AM.(Strickler, Stephanie)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Grossman & Karaszewski, PLLC.(Strickler, Stephanie)
June 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - PDF ERROR. Notice to Attorney Stephanie Strickler to RE-FILE Document #14 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. NOTE: Re-save the PDF in PDF-A format. Do not attach a screenshot. (ldi)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Grossman & Karaszewski, PLLC.(Strickler, Stephanie) Modified on 6/28/2019 (ldi).
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties herein shall attend a conference for the purpose of case management and scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 on July 23, 2019 at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom 621, Charles L. Brieant United States Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, New York. Initial Conference set for 7/23/2019 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel. (mml)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Stephanie A. Strickler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Nicole M. Strickler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
June 26, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Nicole M. Strickler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17140242. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #9 MOTION for Stephanie A. Strickler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17140273. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Grossman & Karaszewski, PLLC.(Strickler, Nicole)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Stephanie A. Strickler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17140273. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Grossman & Karaszewski, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Strickler, Stephanie)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Nicole M. Strickler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17140242. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Grossman & Karaszewski, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Strickler, Nicole)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Grossman & Karaszewski, PLLC served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. Service was accepted by David Hubert, Manager. Document filed by Sarah Greifman. (Barshay, David)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Michael Barshay on behalf of Sarah Greifman. (Barshay, David)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Michael Barshay on behalf of Sarah Greifman. (Barshay, David)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Grossman & Karaszewski, PLLC. (pne)
May 21, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
May 21, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
May 21, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sanders, Craig)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Grossman & Karaszewski, PLLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sarah Greifman. (Sanders, Craig)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Grossman & Karaszewski, PLLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16918841)Document filed by Sarah Greifman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sanders, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greifman v. Grossman & Karaszewski, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Greifman
Represented By: Craig B. Sanders
Represented By: David Michael Barshay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grossman & Karaszewski, PLLC
Represented By: Nicole Marie Strickler
Represented By: Stephanie Strickler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?