Balchem Corporation et al v. Starr Technical Risks Agency, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Albion Laboratories, Inc. and Balchem Corporation
Defendant: Starr Technical Risks Agency, Inc. and ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 7:2019cv04666
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332in
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Seibel: Pre-Motion Conference held on 7/19/2019. Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to be submitted by August 9, 2019; Defendant's opposition due August 30, 2019; reply due September 9, 2019. See transcript. (Court Reporter Sabrina D'Emidio) (wc)
June 24, 2019 Filing 22 LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Charles J. Rocco dated 06/24/2019 re: Response to Plaintiffs' Letter (ECF No.14). Document filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Starr Technical Risks Agency, Inc..(Rocco, Charles)
June 21, 2019 Filing 21 LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Bryon J. Benevento dated June 21, 2019 re: response to pre-motion letter (Dkt. No. 10). Document filed by Albion Laboratories, Inc., Balchem Corporation.(Benevento, Bryon)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Michael L. Foran to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
June 14, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #19 MOTION for Michael L. Foran to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17084229. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
June 14, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Michael L. Foran to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17084229. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Starr Technical Risks Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Michael L. Foran, #2 Certificate of Good Standing -New York, #3 Certificate of Good Standing- Illinois, #4 Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Foran, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. Pre-motion conference rescheduled for July 19, 2019 at 3 p.m. Pre-Motion Conference set for 7/19/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 6/10/2019) (mml)
June 10, 2019 Filing 17 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Charles J. Rocco Esq. dated 06/10/2019. Document filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Starr Technical Risks Agency, Inc..(Rocco, Charles)
June 7, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Ace American Insurance Company.(Rocco, Charles)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER terminating #14 Letter Motion for Conference. We will discuss this at the already scheduled pre-motion conference set for 7/2/19. Defendants should state their position, by letter of no more than 3 pages, by June 25, 2019. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Doc. 14. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 6/6/2019) (kv)
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Kaleb McNeely dated June 6, 2019. Document filed by Albion Laboratories, Inc., Balchem Corporation.(Benevento, Bryon)
June 6, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Balchem Corporation for Albion Laboratories, Inc.. Document filed by Albion Laboratories, Inc..(Benevento, Bryon)
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Balchem Corporation.(Benevento, Bryon)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Conference. A pre-motion conference will be held on July 2, 2019 at 12:00 p.m. Plaintiffs should state their position, by letter of no more than 3 pages, by June 25, 2019. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Doc. 10. Pre-Motion Conference set for 7/2/2019 at 12:00 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 6/5/2019) (mro)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Charles J. Rocco dated 06/05/2019. Document filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Starr Technical Risks Agency, Inc..(Rocco, Charles)
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bryon J Benevento on behalf of Albion Laboratories, Inc., Balchem Corporation. (Benevento, Bryon)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kaleb McNeely on behalf of Albion Laboratories, Inc., Balchem Corporation. (McNeely, Kaleb)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendants may have until 6/7/19 to respond to the Complaint. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Motion addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Ashley Vicere dated May 24, 2019. Document filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Starr Technical Risks Agency, Inc..(Vicere, Ashley)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ashley Christine Vicere on behalf of Ace American Insurance Company, Starr Technical Risks Agency, Inc.. (Vicere, Ashley)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rocco, Charles)
May 22, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 22, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
May 22, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
May 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Charles J. Rocco. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Office code Foley Square; Dollar Demand $4,600,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Office code has been modified to White Plains; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $4,600,000;. (pc)
May 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Charles J. Rocco to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Multiple citizenship of principal parties for the plaintiff and defendant were selected. Choose one for each. (pc)
May 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Charles J. Rocco. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Balchem Corporation, Albion Laboratories, Inc., Starr Technical Risks Agency, Inc., ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rocco, Charles)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate Chubb INA Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Chubb Group Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate INA Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate INA Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate INA Corporation for ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. Document filed by ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY.(Rocco, Charles)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Orange. Case Number: EF003397/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16924393).Document filed by ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A -State Court Filing, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-Policy, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C-State Court Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Rocco, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balchem Corporation et al v. Starr Technical Risks Agency, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr Technical Risks Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Michael L. Foran
Represented By: Ashley Christine Vicere
Represented By: Charles J. Rocco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Charles J. Rocco
Represented By: Michael L. Foran
Represented By: Ashley Christine Vicere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albion Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Bryon J Benevento
Represented By: Kaleb McNeely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Balchem Corporation
Represented By: Bryon J Benevento
Represented By: Kaleb McNeely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?