Martinez v. SkyGroup Investments, LLC
Plaintiff: Pedro Martinez
Defendant: SkyGroup Investments, LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv05628
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. SkyGroup Investments, LLC waiver sent on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. Document filed by Pedro Martinez. (Shaked, Dan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to SkyGroup Investments, LLC. (jgo)
June 18, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
June 18, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SkyGroup Investments, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Pedro Martinez. (Shaked, Dan)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Shaked, Dan)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SkyGroup Investments, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17095769)Document filed by Pedro Martinez.(Shaked, Dan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. SkyGroup Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SkyGroup Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Martinez
Represented By: Dan Shaked
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?