Gartlan v. Mahopac Central School District/Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: Christine Gartlan
Defendant: Deborah Legato, Mahopac Central School District/Board of Education, Anthony DiCarlo, Patrice Helly, Brian Fleissner, Dennis Creedon, Leslie Mancuso, Harvey Sotland, Ronald Clamser, Frank Gunn, Ed Caperna, Steven Troost and Pamela Romeo
Case Number: 7:2019cv05878
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 40 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pamela Romeo(In her Individual Capacity), Pamela Romeo(in her official capacity as former Transportation Supervisor). (sj)
August 7, 2019 Filing 39 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to PAMELA ROMEO, in her official and individual capacity as former Transportation Supervisor, re: #28 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Christine Gartlan. (Glass, Bryan)
July 24, 2019 Filing 38 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Frank Gunn(in his official capacity as Transportation Supervisor), Frank Gunn(In his Individual Capacity). (sj)
July 24, 2019 Filing 37 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Patrice Helly(In her Individual Capacity), Patrice Helly(in her official as Schools Transportation Operations Assistant). (sj)
July 24, 2019 Filing 36 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ronald Clamser(In his Individual Capacity), Ronald Clamser(in his official capacity as Assistant Superintendent of Human Resources and Business). (sj)
July 24, 2019 Filing 35 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Harvey Sotland(in his official capacity as Assistant Superintendent of Business), Harvey Sotland(In his Individual Capacity). (sj)
July 23, 2019 Filing 34 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to HARVEY SOTLAND, in his official and individual capacity as Assistant Superintendent of Business, re: #28 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Christine Gartlan. (Glass, Bryan)
July 23, 2019 Filing 33 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to RONALD CLAMSER, in his official and individual capacity as Assistant Superintendent of Human Resources and Business, re: #28 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Christine Gartlan. (Glass, Bryan)
July 23, 2019 Filing 32 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to FRANK GUNN, in his official and individual capacity as Transportation Supervisor, re: #28 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Christine Gartlan. (Glass, Bryan)
July 23, 2019 Filing 31 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to PATRICE HELLY, in her official and individual capacity as Schools Transportation Operations Assistant, re: #28 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Christine Gartlan. (Glass, Bryan)
July 15, 2019 Filing 30 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pamela Romeo(In her Individual Capacity), Pamela Romeo(in her official capacity as former Transportation Supervisor). (pc)
July 12, 2019 Filing 29 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PAMELA ROMEO, in her official and individual capacity as former Transportation Supervisor, re: #28 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Christine Gartlan. (Glass, Bryan)
July 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Bryan David Glass. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Frank Gunn; Patrice Helly; Steven Troost; Deborah Legato; Leslie Mancuso; Dennis Creedon; Ronald Clamser; Brian Fleissner; Ed Caperna; Anthony DiCarlo; Harvey Sotland; Pamela Romeo. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
July 3, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Patrice Helly, Ed Caperna, Ronald Clamser, Dennis Creedon, Anthony DiCarlo, Brian Fleissner, Frank Gunn, Patrice Helly, Deborah Legato, Leslie Mancuso, Pamela Romeo, Harvey Sotland, Steven Troost added. Party added pursuant to #28 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Christine Gartlan. Related document: #28 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,.(Glass, Bryan)
July 2, 2019 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Ed Caperna, Ronald Clamser, Dennis Creedon, Anthony DiCarlo, Brian Fleissner, Frank Gunn, Patrice Helly, Deborah Legato, Mahopac Central School District/Board of Education, Leslie Mancuso, Harvey Sotland, Steven Troost, Pamela Romeo with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Christine Gartlan. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Glass, Bryan)
June 28, 2019 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mahopac Central School District/Board of Education. (sj)
June 28, 2019 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Frank Gunn. (sj)
June 28, 2019 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Patrice Helly. (sj)
June 28, 2019 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Steven Troost. (sj)
June 28, 2019 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Deborah Legato. (sj)
June 28, 2019 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Leslie Mancuso. (sj)
June 28, 2019 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dennis Creedon. (sj)
June 28, 2019 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ronald Clamser. (sj)
June 28, 2019 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Leslie Mancuso. (sj)
June 28, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brian Fleissner. (sj)
June 28, 2019 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ed Caperna. (sj)
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anthony DiCarlo. (sj)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Harvey Sotland. (sj)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HARVEY SOTLAND, in his official and individual capacity as Assistant Superintendent of Business, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Christine Gartlan. (Glass, Bryan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ANTHONY DICARLO, in his official and individual capacity as Superintendent, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Christine Gartlan. (Glass, Bryan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ED CAPERNA, in his official and individual capacity as part-time bus driver, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Christine Gartlan. (Glass, Bryan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BRIAN FLEISSNER, in his official and individual capacity as full-time bus driver, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Christine Gartlan. (Glass, Bryan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to RONALD CLAMSER, in his official and individual capacity as Assistant Superintendent of Human Resources and Business, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Christine Gartlan. (Glass, Bryan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DENNIS CREEDON, in his official and individual capacity as former Superintendent of Schools, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Christine Gartlan. (Glass, Bryan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LESLIE MANCUSO, in her official and individual capacity as President of Board of Education, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Christine Gartlan. (Glass, Bryan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DEBORAH LEGATO, in her official and individual capacity as Assistant Superintendent of Human Resources, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Christine Gartlan. (Glass, Bryan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to STEVEN TROOST, in his official and individual capacity as full-time bus driver and head bus driver, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Christine Gartlan. (Glass, Bryan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PATRICE HELLY, in her official and individual capacity as Schools Transportation Operations Assistant, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Christine Gartlan. (Glass, Bryan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FRANK GUNN, in his official and individual capacity as Transportation Supervisor, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Christine Gartlan. (Glass, Bryan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mahopac Central School District/Board of Education, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Christine Gartlan. (Glass, Bryan)
June 24, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
June 24, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
June 24, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Glass, Bryan)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ed Caperna, Ronald Clamser, Dennis Creedon, Anthony DiCarlo, Brian Fleissner, Frank Gunn, Patrice Helly, Deborah Legato, Mahopac Central School District/Board of Education, Leslie Mancuso, Harvey Sotland, Steven Troost. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17125432)Document filed by Christine Gartlan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Right to Sue Letter)(Glass, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gartlan v. Mahopac Central School District/Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Legato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahopac Central School District/Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony DiCarlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrice Helly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Fleissner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Creedon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Mancuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey Sotland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Clamser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Caperna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Troost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Gartlan
Represented By: Bryan David Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?