Allstate Indemnity Company v. Lowe's Companies, Inc.

Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Defendant: Lowe's Companies Inc. and Lowe's Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv06044
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332ct
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #11 Motion for Matthew Ian Ferrie to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 8/26/2019) (mml)
August 23, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Matthew Ian Ferrie to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17483745. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Matthew Ian Ferrie to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17483745. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Allstate Indemnity Company.(Vergara, Rafael)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jamie Kyle McAleavey on behalf of Lowe's Companies, Inc.. (McAleavey, Jamie)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Indemnity Company. Document filed by Allstate Indemnity Company.(Vergara, Rafael)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rafael Vergara on behalf of Allstate Indemnity Company. (Vergara, Rafael)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: PLAINTIFF, OR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF, SHALL NOTIFY ALL PARTIES, IN WRITING, OF THE CONFERENCE DATE AND TIME, AND PROVIDE ALL PARTIES WITH A COPY OF THIS NOTICE AND THE ATTACHED CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER (UNLESS THE CASE HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM STATE COURT, IN WHICH EVENT COUNSEL FOR THE REMOVING DEFENDANT(S) SHALL PROVIDE SUCH NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES). Initial Conference set for 8/28/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 620, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. (jca)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Lowe's Companies, Inc..(Stern, Joshua)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Stern, Joshua)
July 1, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 1, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
July 1, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
July 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joshua Howard Stern. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Allstate Indemnity Company; Lowe's Companies, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; alias party type was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
July 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joshua Howard Stern. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); Jury Demand code p (Plaintiff); Dollar Demand $52,023,751,000; County code Rockland; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Origin code has been modified to 2 (Removal from State Court); the Jury Demand code has been modified to n (None); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $502,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
July 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Joshua Howard Stern to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF case caption does not exactly match initial pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Lowe's Home Centers, LLC for Lowe's Companies Inc.. Document filed by Lowe's Companies Inc..(Stern, Joshua)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Howard Stern on behalf of Lowe's Companies Inc.. (Stern, Joshua)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Stern, Joshua) Modified on 7/1/2019 (jgo).
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Rockland. Case Number: 302353/19. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17160732).Document filed by Lowe's Companies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavits of Service, #3 Exhibit Stipulation Extending Time to Answer)(Stern, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Indemnity Company v. Lowe's Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Companies Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Howard Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Howard Stern
Represented By: Jamie Kyle McAleavey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Rafael Vergara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?