Van Houten v. Evers
Plaintiff: Emily Van Houten
Defendant: MD Martin Evers
Case Number: 7:2019cv06049
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 15 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Emily Van Houten.(Smith, George)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #13 Motion for Robert J. Aldrich, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 8/12/2019) (mml)
August 12, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for Robert J. Aldrich, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Robert J. Aldrich, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Martin Evers. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Order)(Aldrich, Robert)
August 6, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #12 MOTION for Robert J. Aldrich, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17379588. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Commonwealth of Pennsylvania;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Robert J. Aldrich, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17379588. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Martin Evers. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Order)(Aldrich, Robert) Modified on 8/6/2019 (wb).
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties herein shall attend a conference for the purpose of case management and scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 on September 11, 2019 at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 621, Charles L. Brieant United States Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, New York. Initial Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel. (mml)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Martin Evers.(Dziak, Melissa)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Martin Evers.(Dziak, Melissa)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa Ann Dziak on behalf of Martin Evers. (Dziak, Melissa)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Martin Evers served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. Service was accepted by Martin Evers MD. Document filed by Emily Van Houten. (Smith, George)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Martin Evers. (pc)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Martin Evers MD, re: #3 Complaint. Document filed by Emily Van Houten. (Smith, George)
July 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney George A. Smith to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Summons Returned Executed,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; Court name is not on the PDF;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
July 2, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 2, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
July 2, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
July 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney George A. Smith. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Emily Van Houten; MD Martin Evers. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
July 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney George A. Smith. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1331; Dollar Demand $1,500,000,000; County code Orange; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $1,500,000; the County code has been modified to Ulster; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
July 2, 2019 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #3 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-17161325, paid on 6/28/2019. (jgo)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Document filed by Emily Van Houten. (Smith, George) Modified on 7/2/2019 (jgo).
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Martin Evers. Document filed by Emily Van Houten.(Smith, George)
July 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney George A. Smith to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 7/8/2019. (jgo)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Martin Evers MD, re: Complaint. Document filed by Emily Van Houten. (Smith, George) Modified on 7/2/2019 (jgo).
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Smith, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Houten v. Evers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Martin Evers
Represented By: Melissa Ann Dziak
Represented By: Robert J. Aldrich, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Van Houten
Represented By: George A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?