Haesche v. The County Of Rockland et al
Plaintiff: Marianne Haesche
Defendant: JOHN/JANE 1-10 DOES(S), The County Of Rockland, Dep.County Executive Jose Guillermo Rosa, County Executive Edwin J. Day, Jose Guillermo Rosa, Edwin J. Day, County Of Rockland and John Does and Jane Does 1-10
Case Number: 7:2019cv06054
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Does and Jane Does 1-10. (dnh)
July 24, 2019 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John Does and Jane Does 1-10, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Marianne Haesche. (Marrone, Gerard)
July 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Gerard Michael Marrone to RE-FILE Document No. #11 Request for Issuance of Summons, #12 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'As to' Error; the defendant name listed in the docket entry and on the summons PDF must exactly match the party of record (John Does and Jane Does 1-10 ). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jose Guillermo Rosa. (dnh)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Edwin J. Day. (dnh)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to County Of Rockland. (dnh)
July 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gerard Michael Marrone. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: JOHN/JANE 1-10 DOES(S), Edwin J. Day, Jose Guillermo Rosa, The County Of Rockland. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted; Exclude from the entry of business name any leading A, An or The.. (dnh)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jane Does 1-10, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Marianne Haesche. (Marrone, Gerard) Modified on 7/18/2019 (dnh).
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John Does 1-10, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Marianne Haesche. (Marrone, Gerard) Modified on 7/18/2019 (dnh).
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jose Guillermo Rosa, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Marianne Haesche. (Marrone, Gerard)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Edwin J. Day, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Marianne Haesche. (Marrone, Gerard)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The County of Rockland, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Marianne Haesche. (Marrone, Gerard)
July 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Gerard Michael Marrone to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the caption on the summons PDF contains a typographical error (Joh Does). Include 'c/o' or 'via' before second party names. Attorney information was omitted. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jane Does 1-10, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Marianne Haesche. (Marrone, Gerard) Modified on 7/17/2019 (dnh).
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John Does 1-10, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Marianne Haesche. (Marrone, Gerard) Modified on 7/17/2019 (dnh).
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jose Guillermo Rosa, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Marianne Haesche. (Marrone, Gerard) Modified on 7/17/2019 (dnh).
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Edwin J. Day, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Marianne Haesche. (Marrone, Gerard) Modified on 7/17/2019 (dnh).
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The County of Rockland, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Marianne Haesche. (Marrone, Gerard) Modified on 7/17/2019 (dnh).
July 2, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Cathy Seibel. Judge J. Paul Oetken is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
July 2, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so redesignated. (ad)
July 1, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
July 1, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (gp)
July 1, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (gp)
July 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gerard Michael Marrone. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: JOHN/JANE 1-10 DOES(S). The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (gp)
July 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gerard Michael Marrone. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 443 (Civil Rights: Accomodations);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 445 (Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment). (gp)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Marrone, Gerard)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN/JANE 1-10 DOES(S), Edwin J. Day, Jose Guillermo Rosa, The County Of Rockland. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17162252)Document filed by Marianne Haesche.(Marrone, Gerard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haesche v. The County Of Rockland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE 1-10 DOES(S)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The County Of Rockland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dep.County Executive Jose Guillermo Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Executive Edwin J. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Guillermo Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin J. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Of Rockland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does and Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianne Haesche
Represented By: Gerard Michael Marrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?