Wave Linx LLC v. Broadview Networks, Inc.
Plaintiff: Wave Linx LLC
Defendant: Broadview Networks, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv06085
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #12 Motion for Daniel S. Leventhal to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing disciplining attorneys. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 8/12/2019) (kv)
August 12, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 MOTION for Daniel S. Leventhal to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17412902. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Daniel S. Leventhal to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17412902. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Broadview Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Daniel S. Leventhal in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Texas Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Leventhal, Daniel)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Windstream Holding, Inc. for Broadview Networks, Inc.. Document filed by Broadview Networks, Inc..(Archer, Judith)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY upon the record as to Broadview Networks, Inc. and Notice of the Automatic Stay. Document filed by Broadview Networks, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Archer, Judith)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Broadview Networks, Inc. served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. Service was accepted by Joe Johnson, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Wave Linx LLC. (Loaknauth, Nicholas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against Broadview Networks, Inc.. Document filed by Wave Linx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Patent No. US8843549, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Exemplary Claim Chart)(Loaknauth, Nicholas)
July 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
July 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Cathy Seibel. Judge Lorna G. Schofield is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (pc)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Broadview Networks, Inc.. (pc)
July 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Nicholas Netram Loaknauth to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
July 1, 2019 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (pc)
July 1, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 1, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
July 1, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
July 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Nicholas Netram Loaknauth. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Wave Linx LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Loaknauth, Nicholas)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Wave Linx LLC.(Loaknauth, Nicholas)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Broadview Networks, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Wave Linx LLC. (Loaknauth, Nicholas)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Loaknauth, Nicholas)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against Wave Linx LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17165380)Document filed by Wave Linx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Patent No. US8843549, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Exemplary Claim Chart)(Loaknauth, Nicholas) Modified on 7/1/2019 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wave Linx LLC v. Broadview Networks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wave Linx LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Netram Loaknauth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadview Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Scott Leventhal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?