Allstate Indemnity Company v. Hose Assemblies, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Defendant: Hose Assemblies, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv06169
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Pre-Motion Conference set for 9/27/2019 at 04:15 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel. (mml)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Pre-motion conference adjourned to 9/27/19 at 4:15 pm. Plaintiff's letter due 9/20/19. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 8/28/2019) (mml)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time and Adjournment of [D.E. 11] addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Jennifer Huang dated August 28, 2019. Document filed by Hose Assemblies, Inc..(Huang, Jennifer)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #10 Letter filed by Hose Assemblies, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Pre-motion conference to be held on 9/13/19 at 4 pm. Plaintiff shall respond to this letter by 9/6/19. SO ORDERED., ( Pre-Motion Conference set for 9/13/2019 at 04:00 PM before Judge Cathy Seibel.) (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 8/23/2019) (ama)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Jennifer Huang dated August 23, 2019 re: Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Hose Assemblies, Inc..(Huang, Jennifer)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Huang on behalf of Hose Assemblies, Inc.. (Huang, Jennifer)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hose Assemblies, Inc.. (jgo)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hose Assemblies, Inc., re: #6 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Allstate Indemnity Company. (Murphy, Dennis)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Hose Assemblies, Inc..Document filed by Allstate Indemnity Company. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Murphy, Dennis)
July 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Dennis Daniel Murphy to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Summons must be linked to the corresponding pleading accepted by the court. Caption on summons PDF must exactly match the caption on the pleading accepted by the court. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
July 19, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Dennis Daniel Murphy to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): A complaint has already been accepted by the court. If changes are required, an Amended Complaint must be filed. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Murphy, Dennis)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hose Assemblies, Inc., re: #3 Complaint. Document filed by Allstate Indemnity Company. (Murphy, Dennis) Modified on 7/19/2019 (dnh).
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - COMPLAINT against Hose Assemblies, Inc.. Document filed by Allstate Indemnity Company.(Murphy, Dennis) Modified on 7/19/2019 (dnh).
July 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Dennis Daniel Murphy to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF case caption does not exactly match initial pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
July 3, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 3, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
July 3, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
July 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Dennis Daniel Murphy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Allstate Indemnity Company; Hose Assemblies, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; alias was entered incorrectly. (jgo)
July 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Dennis Daniel Murphy. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
July 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Dennis Daniel Murphy re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add party Harrington Capital Management LLC. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (jgo)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hose Assemblies, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Allstate Indemnity Company a/s/o David Waxenberg and Jodi Waxenberg. (Murphy, Dennis) Modified on 7/3/2019 (jgo).
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hose Assemblies, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17180294)Document filed by Allstate Indemnity Company a/s/o David Waxenberg and Jodi Waxenberg.(Murphy, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Indemnity Company v. Hose Assemblies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Dennis Daniel Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hose Assemblies, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?