Williams v. Lewis et al
Plaintiff: Wayne Williams
Defendant: APS Transport LLC, James Lewis, Unibraz Logistic LLC, Unibraz Logistics, LLC and APS Transport, LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv06175
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332nr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Conference: Counsel for defendants may appear at the 10/3/2019 conference by telephone by calling Chambers at (914) 390-4166. All counsel appearing by telephone shall be on the line before calling Chambers. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (del)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: 6 Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference, (Request for Appearance at Conference Telephonically) addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Joel B. Schechter, Esq. dated August 7, 2019. Document filed by APS Transport, LLC, James Lewis, Unibraz Logistics, LLC. Return Date set for 10/3/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Schechter, Joel)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference: The 9/10/2019 conference is adjourned to 10/3/2019, at 9:30 a.m. Defense counsel is instructed to inform plaintiff's counsel about the adjournment, and plaintiff's counsel is directed to file a notice of appearance on the docket. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (del)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Joel B. Schechter, Esq. dated August 6, 2019. Document filed by APS Transport, LLC, James Lewis, Unibraz Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Schechter, Joel)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/10/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 620, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. (rro)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by APS Transport, LLC, James Lewis, Unibraz Logistics, LLC(Schechter, Joel)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Schechter, Joel)
July 3, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 3, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
July 3, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
July 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joel B Schechter. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: APS Transport, LLC; Unibraz Logistics, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
July 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joel B Schechter. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code d (Defendant); Dollar Demand $1710000000; County code Rockland; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to n (None); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $1710000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
July 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Joel B Schechter. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet separately. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Rockland. Case Number: 031239/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17181285).Document filed by Unibraz Logistic LLC, APS Transport LLC, James Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit Supplemental Summons & Amended Verified Complaint, #3 Exhibit Verified Answer, #4 Exhibit Supplemental Demand for Relief, #5 Exhibit Notice of Filing, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schechter, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Lewis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APS Transport LLC
Represented By: Joel B Schechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Lewis
Represented By: Joel B Schechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unibraz Logistic LLC
Represented By: Joel B Schechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unibraz Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Joel B Schechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APS Transport, LLC
Represented By: Joel B Schechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?