Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford et al v. Cutting Edge Lawn Service and Landscaping, LLC
Plaintiff: Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford and Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.
Defendant: Cutting Edge Lawn Service and Landscaping, LLC d/b/a Clearway Industries and Cutting Edge Lawn Service and Landscaping, LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv06316
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to CUTTING EDGE LAWN SERVICE AND LANDSCAPING LLC, d/b/a CLEARWAY INDUSTRIES, issued on August 23, 2019. (dt)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Mark G. Ledwin in Support re: #9 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,. Document filed by Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit B- Certificate of Service)(Ledwin, Mark)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Request for Clerk's Certificate) (Ledwin, Mark) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
August 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: Notice to Attorney Mark Ledwin. RE-FILE Document No. #8 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the proposed clerk's certificate of default is the wrong document; Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default found under the event list Proposed Orders - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct PDF that - lists the correct filed date of the complaint, lists the correct name(s) of the party(ies) who was/were served, lists the correct date the party(ies) was/were served, lists the correct filed date of the proof of service. File the Clerk's Certificate of Default with the Request for Clerk's Certificate as an attachment, then separately file the Affirmation in Support under Other Answers as an Affirmation in Support of a Non-Motion. (dt)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Ledwin, Mark) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 8/23/2019 (dt). Modified on 8/23/2019 (dt).
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Defendant Cutting Edge Lawn Service on 07/23/2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Ledwin, Mark)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Cutting Edge Lawn Service and Landscaping, LLC served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. Service was accepted by NY Secretary of State. Document filed by Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford; Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Ledwin, Mark)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cutting Edge Lawn Service and Landscaping, LLC. (sj)
July 9, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
July 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
July 9, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
July 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Mark Gregory Ledwin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1330; Dollar Demand $135,134,000; County code Orange. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $135,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
July 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Mark Gregory Ledwin. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Cutting Edge Lawn Service and Landscaping LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party type was entered incorrectly. (sj)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cutting Edge Lawn Service and Landscaping LLC d/b/a Clearway Industries, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Ledwin, Mark)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. Document filed by Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd..(Ledwin, Mark)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ledwin, Mark)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17206160)Document filed by Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd..(Ledwin, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford et al v. Cutting Edge Lawn Service and Landscaping, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford
Represented By: Mark Gregory Ledwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Mark Gregory Ledwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cutting Edge Lawn Service and Landscaping, LLC d/b/a Clearway Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cutting Edge Lawn Service and Landscaping, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?