Neumann v. Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC
Plaintiff: David Neumann
Defendant: Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv06750
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Easley Apostola on behalf of David Neumann. (Apostola, Elizabeth)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Zemel on behalf of David Neumann. (Zemel, Daniel)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC.(Dominczyk, Thomas)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dominczyk, Thomas)
July 22, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 22, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
July 22, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
July 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Thomas Robert Dominczyk to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Second page is missing. (pc)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dominczyk, Thomas) Modified on 7/22/2019 (pc).
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Rockland. Case Number: 33234/2019..Document filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC.(Dominczyk, Thomas)
July 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Thomas Robert Dominczyk to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Amended Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; Initial Notice of Removal was not filed correctly. Initial Notice of Removal must be filed correctly before an Amended Notice of Removal can be filed. The Amended Notice of Removal caption title must also read "Amended Notice of Removal" and not read "Eastern District of New York". Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
July 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Thomas Robert Dominczyk to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; Caption includes "Eastern District of New York". Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 7/29/2019. (pc)
July 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Thomas Robert Dominczyk. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: David Neumann. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
July 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Thomas Robert Dominczyk. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC.(Dominczyk, Thomas)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL against David Neumann; amending #1 Notice of Removal,.Document filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal,.(Dominczyk, Thomas) Modified on 7/22/2019 (pc).
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Rockland. Case Number: 33234/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17277442).Document filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal to State Court, #3 Proof of Service)(Dominczyk, Thomas) Modified on 7/22/2019 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neumann v. Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Neumann
Represented By: Daniel Zemel
Represented By: Elizabeth Easley Apostola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Robert Dominczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?