DeRico v. Shire, PLC. et al
Plaintiff: MaryAnn DeRico
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Lincoln National Corporation, David Peckman, Shire, PLC., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc., The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Shire Viropharma Incorporated and Shire US, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv06764
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vincent L Briccetti
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331fm
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: The time for defendants The Lincoln National Corporation, The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (the "Liberty and Lincoln Defendants") to answer, move, or otherwise respond is extended to 10/10/2019. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (del)
September 9, 2019 Filing 43 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,, addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Evan B. Citron dated September 9, 2019. Document filed by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Lincoln National Corporation, The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.(Citron, Evan)
September 9, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evan Benjamin Citron on behalf of Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Lincoln National Corporation, The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Citron, Evan)
August 1, 2019 Filing 41 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.. (dnh)
August 1, 2019 Filing 40 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc.. (dnh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 39 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by MaryAnn DeRico. (Lowe, Christopher)
July 31, 2019 Filing 38 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by MaryAnn DeRico. (Lowe, Christopher)
July 31, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Christopher Howard Lowe to RE-FILE Document No. #23 Request for Issuance of Summons, #22 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the defendant name listed on the summons PDF and in the docket entry must exactly match the party of record. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 37 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shire US, Inc.. (dnh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 36 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shire, PLC.. (dnh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 35 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shire Viropharma Incorporated. (dnh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 34 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (dnh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 33 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited. (dnh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 32 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lincoln National Corporation. (dnh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 31 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (dnh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 30 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Liberty Mutual Group Inc.. (dnh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (dnh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Peckman. (dnh)
July 30, 2019 Filing 27 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shire Us, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by MaryAnn DeRico. (Lowe, Christopher)
July 30, 2019 Filing 26 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shire, Plc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by MaryAnn DeRico. (Lowe, Christopher)
July 30, 2019 Filing 25 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shire Viropharma Incorporated, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by MaryAnn DeRico. (Lowe, Christopher)
July 30, 2019 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by MaryAnn DeRico. (Lowe, Christopher)
July 30, 2019 Filing 23 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Takeda Pharmaceutical U.S.A., Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by MaryAnn DeRico. (Lowe, Christopher) Modified on 7/31/2019 (dnh).
July 30, 2019 Filing 22 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Takeda Pharmaceutical International, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by MaryAnn DeRico. (Lowe, Christopher) Modified on 7/31/2019 (dnh).
July 30, 2019 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by MaryAnn DeRico. (Lowe, Christopher)
July 30, 2019 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lincoln National Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by MaryAnn DeRico. (Lowe, Christopher)
July 30, 2019 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by MaryAnn DeRico. (Lowe, Christopher)
July 30, 2019 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Liberty Mutual Group Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by MaryAnn DeRico. (Lowe, Christopher)
July 30, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by MaryAnn DeRico. (Lowe, Christopher)
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Peckman, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by MaryAnn DeRico. (Lowe, Christopher)
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Milana Dostanitch on behalf of MaryAnn DeRico. (Dostanitch, Milana)
July 30, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Christopher Howard Lowe to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #11 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #10 Request for Issuance of Summons, #14 Request for Issuance of Summons, #12 Request for Issuance of Summons, #13 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the caption on the summons PDF must exactly match the caption on the pleading. Do not abbreviate party names. If the entire caption does not fit, list the leading defendant followed by 'et al'. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Takeda Pharmaceutical International, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by MaryAnn DeRico. (Lowe, Christopher) Modified on 7/30/2019 (dnh).
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Takeda Pharmaceutical U.S.A., Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by MaryAnn DeRico. (Lowe, Christopher) Modified on 7/30/2019 (dnh).
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by MaryAnn DeRico. (Lowe, Christopher) Modified on 7/30/2019 (dnh).
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by MaryAnn DeRico. (Lowe, Christopher) Modified on 7/30/2019 (dnh).
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Liberty Mutual Group Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by MaryAnn DeRico. (Lowe, Christopher) Modified on 7/30/2019 (dnh).
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by MaryAnn DeRico. (Lowe, Christopher) Modified on 7/30/2019 (dnh).
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by MaryAnn DeRico. (Lowe, Christopher) Modified on 7/30/2019 (dnh).
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LINCOLN NATIONAL CORPORATION, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by MaryAnn DeRico. (Lowe, Christopher) Modified on 7/30/2019 (dnh).
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Peckman, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by MaryAnn DeRico. (Lowe, Christopher) Modified on 7/30/2019 (dnh).
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SHIRE VIROPHARMA INCORPORATED, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by MaryAnn DeRico. (Lowe, Christopher) Modified on 7/30/2019 (dnh).
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SHIRE US, INC., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by MaryAnn DeRico. (Lowe, Christopher) Modified on 7/30/2019 (dnh).
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SHIRE, PLC., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by MaryAnn DeRico. (Lowe, Christopher) Modified on 7/30/2019 (dnh).
July 22, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
July 22, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
July 22, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lowe, Christopher)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Lincoln National Corporation, David Peckman, Shire US, Inc., Shire Viropharma Incorporated, Shire, PLC., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17280200)Document filed by MaryAnn DeRico.(Lowe, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeRico v. Shire, PLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Evan Benjamin Citron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group Inc.
Represented By: Evan Benjamin Citron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Corporation
Represented By: Evan Benjamin Citron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Peckman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shire, PLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Evan Benjamin Citron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Evan Benjamin Citron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shire Viropharma Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shire US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MaryAnn DeRico
Represented By: Christopher Howard Lowe
Represented By: Milana Dostanitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?