Canopius US Insurance, Inc. v. Five Brothers Realty Holdings Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Canopius US Insurance, Inc.
Defendant: Five Brothers Realty Holdings Corp., Lain A Linda and Linda A. Lain
Case Number: 7:2019cv06840
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Rule 7.1 Disclosure served on Five Brothers Realty Holdings Corp. on August 28, 2019. Document filed by Canopius US Insurance, Inc.. (Billings, William)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Canopius Group Limited, Corporate Parent Sompo Japan Nipponkoa Holdings, Inc. for Canopius US Insurance, Inc.. Document filed by Canopius US Insurance, Inc..(Billings, William)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Declaratory Judgment Complaint served on Linda A. Lain on July 29, 2019. Service was accepted by Linda A. Lain, Defendant. Document filed by Canopius US Insurance, Inc.. (Billings, William)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons in a Civil Action and Declaratory Judgment Complaint with Exhibits served on Five Brother Realty Holdings Corp. on August 8, 2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Business Document Specialist II, NY Secretary of State, Department of State being Registered Agent of Record. Document filed by Canopius US Insurance, Inc.. (Billings, William)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Canopius US Insurance, Inc.. Document filed by Five Brothers Realty Holdings Corp..(Byrd, Kristen)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Silas Investments, LLC, Corporate Parent NYC Metro Holdings Corp. for Five Brothers Realty Holdings Corp.. Document filed by Five Brothers Realty Holdings Corp..(Byrd, Kristen)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Five Brothers Realty Holdings Corp., Linda A. Lain. (dnh)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FIVE BROTHERS REALTY HOLDINGS CORP. and LINDA A. LAIN, re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Canopius US Insurance, Inc.. (Billings, William)
July 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney William Michael Billings to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the request for issuance of summons; select the plaintiff (Canopius US Insurance, Inc.) as the filer. Select the defendants listed on the PDF (Five Brothers Realty Holdings Corp. and Linda A Lain) as to whom the summons is being requested in the docket entry. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
July 24, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
July 24, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
July 24, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
July 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney William Michael Billings. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 05:552 Freedom of Information Act; Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); County code Westchester; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332 Diversity Action; the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 1 (Citizen of This State); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh)
July 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney William Michael Billings. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Five Brothers Realty Holdings Corp., Lain A Linda, Canopius US Insurance, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Billings, William)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #3 Complaint,. Document filed by Five Brothers Realty Holdings Corp., Lain A Linda. (Billings, William) Modified on 7/24/2019 (dnh).
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Five Brothers Realty Holdings Corp., Lain A Linda. Document filed by Canopius US Insurance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy, #2 Exhibit Agreement, #3 Exhibit Reservation of Rights, #4 Exhibit Denial Letter)(Billings, William)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Five Brothers Realty Holdings Corp., Lain A Linda. Document filed by Canopius US Insurance, Inc..(Billings, William) Modified on 7/24/2019 (dnh).
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Five Brothers Realty Holdings Corp., Lain A Linda. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17298146)Document filed by Canopius US Insurance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Ex A. Policy, #4 Exhibit Ex B - Non-Waiver Agreement, #5 Exhibit Ex C - 2/1/19 Reservation of Rights, #6 Exhibit 5/10/19 Denial Letter)(Billings, William) Modified on 7/24/2019 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canopius US Insurance, Inc. v. Five Brothers Realty Holdings Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five Brothers Realty Holdings Corp.
Represented By: Kristen Alexandra M. Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lain A Linda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda A. Lain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canopius US Insurance, Inc.
Represented By: William Michael Billings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?