Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company v. Hoffman International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company formerly known as Darwin Select Insurance Company a subrogee of Tappan Zee Contructors, LLC
Defendant: Grove U.S. LLC, The Manitowoc Company, Inc. and Hoffman International, Inc., d/b/a Hoffman Equipment Company
Petitioner: Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Respondent: Hoffman International, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv06931
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332nr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 7:17-cv-8874. Document filed by Grove U.S. LLC, The Manitowoc Company, Inc..(Kenney, Brian)
July 29, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Kenneth M. Karas as possibly related to 17-cv-8874. (jgo)
July 29, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 29, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
July 29, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Brian Robert Kenney. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company; Hoffman International, Inc.; The Manitowoc Company, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; aliases were entered incorrectly. (jgo)
July 29, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Brian Robert Kenney. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Office code Foley Square; Cause of Action code 28:1441; Jury Demand code n (None); Dollar Demand $2428929000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Office code has been modified to White Plains; the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the Jury Demand code has been modified to d (Defendant); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $2428000;. (jgo)
July 29, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Brian Robert Kenney, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 59202/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17317651).Document filed by Grove U.S. LLC, The Manitowoc Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Verified Answer, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Kenney, Brian)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kenney, Brian)
July 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Brian Robert Kenney to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated June 2017; the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet; Jury Demand code - no selection;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
July 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Brian Robert Kenney to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Petition (Other). The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the wrong event type was used to file the pleading; the PDF must be titled either 'Notice of Removal' or 'Petition for Removal'. If filing a 'Petition for Removal' the parties on the PDF must be titled 'Petitioner(s) against Respondent(s)'. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 7/31/2019. (jgo)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - PETITION FOR REMOVAL. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17310000).Document filed by Grove U.S. LLC, The Manitowoc Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Verified Answer, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Kenney, Brian) Modified on 7/26/2019 (jgo).
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Westchester. Case Number: 59202/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17309802).Document filed by Grove U.S. LLC, The Manitowoc Company, Inc..(Kenney, Brian) Modified on 7/26/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company v. Hoffman International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grove U.S. LLC
Represented By: Brian Robert Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Manitowoc Company, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Robert Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoffman International, Inc., d/b/a Hoffman Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company formerly known as Darwin Select Insurance Company a subrogee of Tappan Zee Contructors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Hoffman International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?