Valentine v. Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Kendall Valentine
Defendant: Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company
Case Number: 7:2019cv07401
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company.(Muraidekh, Alan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company.(Muraidekh, Alan)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. Service was accepted by Alison Pactong. Document filed by Kendall Valentine. (Kantor, Steven)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company. (dnh)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kendall Valentine. (Kantor, Steven)
August 9, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
August 9, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
August 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Steven Lawrence Kantor to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney address field is blank;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
August 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Steven Lawrence Kantor. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Office code Foley Square; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Office code has been modified to White Plains; the County code has been modified to Putnam;. (pc)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kendall Valentine. (Kantor, Steven) Modified on 8/9/2019 (pc).
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kantor, Steven)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17393538)Document filed by Kendall Valentine.(Kantor, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valentine v. Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro-North Commuter Railroad Company
Represented By: Alan Muraidekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendall Valentine
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?