U.S. Bank National Association v. Parker et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: Nancy A Parker and Ernesto Parker
Case Number: 7:2019cv07595
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332fc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Ernesto Parker served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. Service was accepted by Ernesto Parker, self. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Nancy A Parker served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. Service was accepted by Nathaniel Parker, son. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nancy A Parker, Ernesto Parker. (pne)
August 15, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
August 15, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
August 15, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bank N.A., Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank National Association. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association.(Bebirian, Nicholas)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ernesto Parker and Nancy A. Parker, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A Parker, Ernesto Parker. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17425768)Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Merit pursuant to CPLR 3012-b)(Bebirian, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. Parker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernesto Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Nicholas John Bebirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?